Soto et al v. Delta Air Lines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hector Soto and Loretta Soto
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc., Aeroterm Properties, LLC and Realterm, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv06721
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC Order Dismissing: All claims and cross claims as to defendants Realterm, LLC and Aeroterm Properties, LLC, only. See entry #10 . Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 1/24/2020. (Innelli, Michael)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION and ORDER: All claims and cross claims as to defendants Aeroterm Properties, LLC and Realterm, LLC are dismissed. By February 24, 2020 the plaintiff shall serve and file an amended complaint adding defendant Aero JFK, LLC. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 1/24/2020. (Innelli, Michael)
January 24, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement by Hector Soto, Loretta Soto. (Rubin, Scott)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, asserted by Defendant JFK Aero, LLC by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Shearer, Douglas)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aeroterm Properties, LLC, Realterm, LLC (Wexler, Fred)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 AERO JFK, LLC (incorrectly sued herein as Aeroterm Properties, LLC and Realterm, LLC) ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiffs, CROSSCLAIM AERO JFK, LLC (incorrectly sued herein as Aeroterm Properties, LLC and Realterm, LLC) against Delta Air Lines, Inc. by Aeroterm Properties, LLC, Realterm, LLC. (Wexler, Fred)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on February 27, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. All counsel are required to attend. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. At least five days before the Conference, the parties must file a completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/pub/PK-discovplan.pdf. Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to ensure that defendants are aware of the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 12/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Plan) (Riquelme, Claudia)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 27, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Shearer, Douglas)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Delta Air Lines, Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York County of Queens, case number 712906/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12109234) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Shearer, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soto et al v. Delta Air Lines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Soto
Represented By: Scott D. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Soto
Represented By: Scott D. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Andrew Shearer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aeroterm Properties, LLC
Represented By: Fred G. Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Realterm, LLC
Represented By: Fred G. Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?