Ahmed et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Tayeeba Jannat, Belal Ahmed and Safia Sharmin
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney General William P. Barr, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Ken Cuccinelli, ABC Agency 1-10, United States Bureau of Consular Arrairs, USCIS Texas Service Center and Kevin McAleenan
Case Number: 1:2019cv06864
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER re: #5 . The premotion conference is waived. This letter is deemed to constitute defendants' motion to dismiss pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). Plaintiff's opposition, if any, is due 2/3/2020. The Court will hear argument on the motion on 2/5/2020 at 2:15 pm in Courtroom 8D South. The Initial Status Conference previously set for 1/21/2020 is adjourned without date. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/17/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 Letter requesting a pre-motion conference by ABC Agency 1-10, Ken Cuccinelli, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Attorney General William P. Barr, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, USCIS Texas Service Center, United States Bureau of Consular Arrairs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Smith, Sheldon)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheldon A. Smith on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Smith, Sheldon)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the Honorable Brian M. Cogan for an Initial Status Conference on 1/21/2020 at 11:30 am in Chambers 704S. Principal trial counsel must appear at this and all subsequent conferences. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to notify all attorneys in this action of the conference schedule in writing. No later than 24 hours prior to the Initial Status Conference, the Government must file a brief letter advising the Court whether the status of the case has changed since the filing of the complaint. Counsel is directed to review Judge Cogan's Individual Practices, which may be obtained on the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/content/judge-brian-m-cogan. Requests for adjournment of the conference will be considered only if made in writing and otherwise in accordance with Judge Cogan's Rules. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/9/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Davis, Kimberly)
December 5, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653146052 (Davis, Kimberly)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABC Agency 1-10, Ken Cuccinelli, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Attorney General William P. Barr, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, USCIS Texas Service Center, filed by Tayeeba Jannat, Belal Ahmed, Safia Sharmin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahmed et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services
Represented By: Sheldon A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney General William P. Barr
Represented By: Sheldon A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Sheldon A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Represented By: Sheldon A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Represented By: Sheldon A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cuccinelli
Represented By: Sheldon A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Agency 1-10
Represented By: Sheldon A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Consular Arrairs
Represented By: Sheldon A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS Texas Service Center
Represented By: Sheldon A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Sheldon A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tayeeba Jannat
Represented By: Khagendra Gharti-Chhetry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belal Ahmed
Represented By: Khagendra Gharti-Chhetry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safia Sharmin
Represented By: Khagendra Gharti-Chhetry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?