Olusola v. Don Coqui Holding Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Solwazi Olusola
Defendant: Don Coqui Holding Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv06909
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Don Coqui Holding Company, LLC has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Don Coqui Holding Company, LLC is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.)
January 23, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Certificate of Default by Solwazi Olusola (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Certificate of Default) (Liebowitz, Richard)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER -- A review of docket entry #6 in this action indicates that the defendant was served on December 13, 2019, and its answer was due on January 3, 2020, but to date has not been filed. No later than January January 24, 2020, one of the following events must occur: (a) the defendant must file an answer, (b) the parties must file a stipulation extending the defendant's time to answer, or (c) the plaintiff must file a request for a certificate of default. If none of the preceding events occurs by the deadline set forth above, I will deem the plaintiff to have abandoned the case and will promptly file a Report and Recommendation urging the assigned District Judge to dismiss the case for failure to prosecute. The plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to his client and to the defendant. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 1/10/2020. (Guy, Alicia)
December 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Solwazi Olusola. Don Coqui Holding Company, LLC served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Liebowitz, Richard)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Don Coqui Holding Company, LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 10, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Don Coqui Holding Company, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12139429 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Solwazi Olusola. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Copyright Form) (Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olusola v. Don Coqui Holding Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solwazi Olusola
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Coqui Holding Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?