Suris v. Fox News Network, LLC
Plaintiff: Yaroslav Suris
Defendant: Fox News Network, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv06957
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Eric R Komitee
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fox News Network, LLC answer due 3/9/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 2/4/2020. (Vasquez, Lea)
January 31, 2020 Filing 10 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Fox News Network, LLC. (Hanswirth, Dori)
January 28, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee. Judge Frederic Block no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Mahoney, Brenna)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Fox News Network, LLC answer due 2/6/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 1/2/2020. (Vasquez, Lea)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Fox News Network, LLC. (Hanswirth, Dori)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fox News Network, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Fox Corporation for Fox News Network, LLC. (Hanswirth, Dori)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Dori Ann Hanswirth on behalf of Fox News Network, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Hanswirth, Dori)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Lk. Shudofsky on behalf of Fox News Network, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Shudofsky, Sara)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yaroslav Suris. Fox News Network, LLC served on 12/17/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Segal, Mitchell)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Fox News Network, LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 11, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fox News Network, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12147863 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Yaroslav Suris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Segal, Mitchell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suris v. Fox News Network, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox News Network, LLC
Represented By: Dori Ann Hanswirth
Represented By: Sara Lk. Shudofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yaroslav Suris
Represented By: Mitchell Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?