Certified Lumber, LLC v. Fassi Gru S.P.A. et al
Plaintiff: Certified Lumber, LLC
Defendant: Fassi Gru S.P.A., Craneworks, Inc. and Fascan International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06974
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Rosenthal on behalf of Fascan International, Inc., Fassi Gru S.P.A. (aty to be noticed) (Rosenthal, Samuel)
January 29, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine DeStefano on behalf of Fascan International, Inc., Fassi Gru S.P.A. (notification declined or already on case) (DeStefano, Katherine)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER dated 1/29/20 granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Katherine A. DeStefano. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/29/2020 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
January 29, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12313424. by Fascan International, Inc., Fassi Gru S.P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (DeStefano, Katherine)
January 28, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Halaiko on behalf of Fascan International, Inc., Fassi Gru S.P.A. (notification declined or already on case) (Halaiko, Michael)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael J. Halaiko. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/27/2020 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
January 27, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12301005. by Fascan International, Inc., Fassi Gru S.P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Halaiko, Michael)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Order re: #16 . Counsel may file his phv motion, which, if otherwise in order, will be conditionally granted subject to supplementing it with current certificates. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/22/2020. (Clarke, Melonie)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Order granting in part #15 . This Court does not wait for an answer to hold the Initial Status conference because, "[i]n truth, the answer in a civil action is the most useless paper in the courthouse." Alexander By and Through Alexander v. Richardson-Merrell Inc., 541 F. Supp. 93, 94 (S.D.N.Y. 1982). Far more informative will be the detailed joint letter that the parties have been previously ordered to file. Nor does the Court adjourn cases for settlement discussions since they can settle any time they want. Nevertheless, based on counsel's recent appearance, the Initial Status Conference is adjourned to 3/5/2020 at 4:30 PM in Chambers 704 South, with the reminder to the parties concerning the requirements for this conference previously posted. In addition, since Craneworks' counsel has been in contact with not-yet-appearing counsel for the Fassi/Fascan defendants, counsel is directed to provide a copy of this Order to Fassi/Fascan counsel. It is highly unlikely that the Court will further adjourn this conference no matter who asks, and the parties can expect a prompt discovery and trial schedule in this case. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/22/2020. (Clarke, Melonie)
January 22, 2020 Filing 16 Letter to Judge Cagan re pro hac vice issue by Fascan International, Inc., Fassi Gru S.P.A. (Halaiko, Michael)
January 22, 2020 Filing 15 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference before the Honorable Brian M. Cogan by Craneworks, Inc.. (Vento, Joseph)
January 22, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Michael Vento on behalf of Craneworks, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Vento, Joseph)
January 21, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Certified Lumber, LLC. Fassi Gru S.P.A. waiver sent on 1/17/2020, answer due 4/16/2020. (Pantzer, Alyssa)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James Michael Cleary, Jr. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/21/2020 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
January 21, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12275645. by Craneworks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Cleary, James)
January 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyssa Jordan Pantzer on behalf of Certified Lumber, LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Pantzer, Alyssa)
January 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B Sena on behalf of Certified Lumber, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Sena, Michael)
January 13, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Certified Lumber, LLC. Craneworks, Inc. waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (Pantzer, Alyssa)
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Certified Lumber, LLC. Fascan International, Inc. waiver sent on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Pantzer, Alyssa)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 1/30/2020 at 10:45 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/19/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Craneworks, Inc., Fascan International, Inc., Fassi Gru S.P.A.. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Certified Lumber, LLC (Pantzer, Alyssa)
December 17, 2019 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit a completed (2 Page Form) Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12151693 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Certified Lumber, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Pantzer, Alyssa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certified Lumber, LLC v. Fassi Gru S.P.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certified Lumber, LLC
Represented By: Alyssa Jordan Pantzer
Represented By: Michael B Sena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fassi Gru S.P.A.
Represented By: Katherine DeStefano
Represented By: Michael J. Halaiko
Represented By: Samuel Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craneworks, Inc.
Represented By: James M Cleary
Represented By: Joseph Michael Vento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fascan International, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine DeStefano
Represented By: Michael J. Halaiko
Represented By: Samuel Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?