United States of America v. Rahman
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Mohammed Mizanur Rahman
Case Number: 1:2019cv07026
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 31:5221
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Mohammed Mizanur Rahman has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Mohammed Mizanur Rahman is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.)
February 4, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Certificate of Default by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Trial Attorney, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Certificate of Default) (Gadelhak, Ali)
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Mohammed Mizanur Rahman served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Gadelhak, Ali)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mohammed Mizanur Rahman. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 18, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Frederic Block. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by United States of America (Gadelhak, Ali)
December 18, 2019 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mohammed Mizanur Rahman Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Gadelhak, Ali)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammed Mizanur Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Ali Gadelhak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?