Genius Media Group Inc. v. Google LLC et al
Plaintiff: Genius Media Group Inc.
Defendant: LyricFind and Google LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv07279
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 12 Letter to Defense Counsel Serving Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Genius Media Group Inc. (Harris, Marion)
January 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. Willen on behalf of Google LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Willen, Brian)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER withdrawing #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #10 Motion to Withdraw. Defendant's counsel is directed to file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 1/24/2020. (Quinlan, Krista)
January 23, 2020 Filing 10 Letter MOTION to Withdraw #9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brian M. Willen for Defendant Google LLC Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12258469. by Google LLC. (Willen, Brian)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER deferring ruling on #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is denied at this time because the affidavit in support of the motion has not been properly notarized and does not fully comply with Local Rule 1.39(c). Counsel is permitted until 1/24/2020 to supplement the application with an updated affidavit. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 1/16/2020. (Quinlan, Krista)
January 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brian M. Willen for Defendant Google LLC Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12258469. by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Brian M. Willen, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Willen, Brian)
January 13, 2020 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Google LLC, LyricFind (Freundlich, Kenneth)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff shall file their motion for remand on or before February 6, 2020; defendants shall file their opposition on or before February 28, 2020; and plaintiff shall reply on or before March 11, 2020. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 1/3/2020. (Williams, Tenisha)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File On Consent Motion to (i) Dismiss, and set a briefing schedule for Motion to Remand by LyricFind. (Freundlich, Kenneth)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Google LLC identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc., Other Affiliate XXVI Holdings Inc. for Google LLC. (Mollick, Jason)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Blake Mollick on behalf of Google LLC (aty to be noticed) (Mollick, Jason)
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 30, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from New York Supreme Court, Kings County, case number Index No. 526241/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12199660) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Freundlich, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genius Media Group Inc. v. Google LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LyricFind
Represented By: Kenneth D. Freundlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Jason Blake Mollick
Represented By: Brian M. Willen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genius Media Group Inc.
Represented By: Marion R. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?