Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Zilberman, D.C. et al
Plaintiff: GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO General Insurance Company and Government Employees Insurance Company
Defendant: Sanford Chiropractic, P.C., Maz Chiropractic, P.C., Dos Manos Chiropractic, P.C., Yakov Zilberman, D.C., Yan Z Chiropractic, P.C. and John Doe Defendants "1" - "10"
Case Number: 1:2020cv00209
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Filing 17 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to March 18, 2020 by Dos Manos Chiropractic, P.C., Maz Chiropractic, P.C., Sanford Chiropractic, P.C., Yan Z Chiropractic, P.C., Yakov Zilberman, D.C.. (Conroy, Matthew)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER: The defendant's letter application #16 for an extension of time to serve and file an answer is DENIED without prejudice to re-file their letter application addressed to MJ Levy who will be handling all pre-trial matters in this case. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 3/9/2020. (Innelli, Michael)
March 9, 2020 Filing 16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to March 18, 2020 by Dos Manos Chiropractic, P.C., Maz Chiropractic, P.C., Sanford Chiropractic, P.C., Yan Z Chiropractic, P.C., Yakov Zilberman, D.C.. (Conroy, Matthew)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 2/20/2020. (Levy, Robert)
February 19, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, by Dos Manos Chiropractic, P.C., Maz Chiropractic, P.C., Sanford Chiropractic, P.C., Yan Z Chiropractic, P.C., Yakov Zilberman, D.C.. (Conroy, Matthew)
February 19, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Sanford Chiropractic, P.C. served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Sirignano, Michael)
February 19, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Maz Chiropractic, P.C. served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Sirignano, Michael)
February 19, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Yan Z Chiropractic, P.C. served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Sirignano, Michael)
February 19, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Yakov Zilberman, D.C. served on 2/11/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (Sirignano, Michael)
February 19, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Dos Manos Chiropractic, P.C. served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Sirignano, Michael)
February 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Conroy on behalf of Dos Manos Chiropractic, P.C., Maz Chiropractic, P.C., Sanford Chiropractic, P.C., Yan Z Chiropractic, P.C., Yakov Zilberman, D.C. (aty to be noticed) (Conroy, Matthew)
February 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Campese on behalf of Dos Manos Chiropractic, P.C., Maz Chiropractic, P.C., Sanford Chiropractic, P.C., Yan Z Chiropractic, P.C., Yakov Zilberman, D.C. (aty to be noticed) (Campese, Maria)
January 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry I. Levy on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Levy, Barry)
January 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Patrick Gorton on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Gorton, Sean)
January 13, 2020 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 13, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dos Manos Chiropractic, P.C., Maz Chiropractic, P.C., Sanford Chiropractic, P.C., Yan Z Chiropractic, P.C., Yakov Zilberman, D.C.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 10, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation for GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Sirignano, Michael)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dos Manos Chiropractic, P.C., John Doe Defendants "1" - "10", Maz Chiropractic, P.C., Sanford Chiropractic, P.C., Yan Z Chiropractic, P.C., Yakov Zilberman, D.C. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12242890 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - NO,, filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons and Rider, #3 Exhibit 1a - Representative Sample of Fraudulent Claims Identified - Yan Z Chiropractic, P.C. (Part 1), #4 Exhibit 1b - Representative Sample of Fraudulent Claims Identified - Yan Z Chiropractic, P.C. (Part 2), #5 Exhibit 2a - Representative Sample of Fraudulent Claims Identified - Maz Chiropractic, P.C. (Part 1), #6 Exhibit 2b - Representative Sample of Fraudulent Claims Identified - Maz Chiropractic, P.C. (Part 2), #7 Exhibit 3 - Representative Sample of Fraudulent Claims Identified - Sanford Chiropractic, P.C., #8 Exhibit 4 - Representative Sample of Fraudulent Claims Identified - Dos Manos Chiropractic, P.C., #9 Exhibit 5 - Recommended Policy of American Association of Neuromuscular and Electrodiagnostic Medicine (AANEM), #10 Exhibit 6 - American Institute of Ultrasound Medicine (AIUM) Official Statement, #11 Exhibit 7 - American Academy of Neurology (AAN) Report, #12 Exhibit 8 - New York State Workers Compensation Board, Mid & Low Back Injury Medical Treatment Guidelines, #13 Exhibit 9 - New York State Insurance Department Opinion Letters) (Sirignano, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Zilberman, D.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanford Chiropractic, P.C.
Represented By: Maria Campese
Represented By: Matthew J. Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maz Chiropractic, P.C.
Represented By: Maria Campese
Represented By: Matthew J. Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dos Manos Chiropractic, P.C.
Represented By: Maria Campese
Represented By: Matthew J. Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yakov Zilberman, D.C.
Represented By: Maria Campese
Represented By: Matthew J. Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yan Z Chiropractic, P.C.
Represented By: Maria Campese
Represented By: Matthew J. Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Defendants "1" - "10"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Represented By: Sean Patrick Gorton
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Represented By: Sean Patrick Gorton
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Represented By: Sean Patrick Gorton
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Represented By: Sean Patrick Gorton
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?