The Estate of Justine Marie Aliotta et al v. Purdue Pharma, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joanne Aliotta, Julissa Cecelia Torres and The Estate of Justine Marie Aliotta
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Walgreen Co, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Duane Reade Inc., Staten Island University Hospital, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., John and Jane Doe Physicians 1 through 10, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., AbbVie Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD, Cardinal Health Inc., Allergan PLC f/k/a/ Actavis PLC, John and Jane Doe Pharmacies 1 through 10, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Allergan Finance, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Purdue Pharma Inc. and Actavis, Inc. (f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.)
Case Number: 1:2020cv00250
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Steven M Gold
Referring Judge: Dora Lizette Irizarry
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 CASE: 1:20-cv-00250 DETAILS: Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:20-op-45043, filed 02/03/2020. (Marziliano, August)
February 3, 2020 Case transferred to District of Northern District of Ohio. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Marziliano, August)
February 3, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFIED COPY OF JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-131: Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of December 5, 2017, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. (Marziliano, August)
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-131: Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of December 5, 2017, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. (Marziliano, August)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint 30 days following: (1) a final decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation or (2) this Courts ruling on Plaintiffs motion to remand. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 1/17/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 1/17/2020. (Gillespie, Saudia)
January 17, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by CVS Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Naunton, Shawn)
January 15, 2020 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 15, 2020 The case of The Estate of Justine Marie Aliotta et al v. Purdue Pharma, Inc. et al, has been transferred from Southern District of New York to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 20cv250. PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 15, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:20-cv-00299. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 14, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York (mro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/15/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: On January 13, 2020, Defendant CVS Health Corporation removed this action from the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Richmond, to the Southern District of New York. (Doc. 1.) Richmond County, however, is in the Eastern District of New York, not in the Southern District. The Court inquired of Defendant CVS Health Corporation's counsel, who requested that the matter be transferred to the Eastern District of New York rather than dismissed. Therefore, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a), it is hereby ORDERED that this case be transferred forthwith to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. The waiting period of Local Rule 83.1 is waived. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 1/14/2020) (mro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/15/2020.]
January 14, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents John and Jane Doe Physicians 1 through 10, John and Jane Doe Pharmacies 1 through 10 added. Party added pursuant to #1 Notice of Removal,.Document filed by CVS Health Corporation. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal,.(Naunton, Shawn) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/15/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/15/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/15/2020.]
January 14, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/15/2020.]
January 14, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Shawn Patrick Naunton re: Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Add John and Jane Doe Physicians 1 through 10 to CM ECF. Add John and Jane Doe Pharmacies 1 through 10 to CM ECF.. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/15/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by CVS Health Corporation.(Naunton, Shawn) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/15/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment listing Defendants)(Naunton, Shawn) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/15/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Richmond. Case Number: 152057/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18489768).Document filed by CVS Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Order Creating JPML)(Naunton, Shawn) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/15/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Estate of Justine Marie Aliotta et al v. Purdue Pharma, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Reade Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staten Island University Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe Physicians 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC f/k/a/ Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe Pharmacies 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Naunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc. (f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Aliotta
Represented By: Christopher Scott Cardillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julissa Cecelia Torres
Represented By: Christopher Scott Cardillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Justine Marie Aliotta
Represented By: Christopher Scott Cardillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?