Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company v. Coastal Environmental Group et al
Plaintiff: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: All Risks, Ltd., Dana Partnership LLP, Global Indemnity Insurance Agency, Inc., Sterling Equipment, Inc., Triton Structural Concrete, Inc., Coastal Environmental Group, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and Aegis Security Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00451
Filed: January 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edward R Korman
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335 Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Aegis Security Insurance Company. (Baum, Theodore)
March 16, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint for Interpleader by Dana Partnership LLP. (Poretz, Ted)
March 9, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore M.B Baum on behalf of Aegis Security Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Baum, Theodore)
March 6, 2020 Filing 14 Letter to Clerk of Court per Rule 50.3.1 of the Eastern Districts Guidelines for the Division of Business Among District Judges by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company (McTaggart, David)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Dismissing Parties Party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Triton Structural Concrete, Inc., All Risks, Ltd. and Global Indemnity Insurance Agency, Inc. terminated.Ordered by Judge Edward R. Korman on 2/27/2020. (Marziliano, August)
February 28, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company. Aegis Security Insurance Company served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020. (McTaggart, David)
February 27, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Aegis Security Insurance Company. (Fernandez, Erica)
February 26, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Dismissal and Amended Complaint served on Coastal Environmental Group, Sterling Equipment, Inc, and Dana Partnership LLP on 2/26/2020, filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company. (McTaggart, David)
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. Re #8 Amended Complaint by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company (McTaggart, David)
February 24, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Coastal Environmental Group, Dana Partnership LLP, Sterling Equipment, Inc., Aegis Security Insurance Company, filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company. (McTaggart, David)
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company dismissing, per FRCP 41(a), Defendants Global Indemnity, All Risks, Liberty Mutual and Triton (McTaggart, David)
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company. Dana Partnership LLP served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020; Sterling Equipment, Inc. served on 2/5/2020, answer due 2/26/2020. (McTaggart, David)
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company. Coastal Environmental Group served on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (McTaggart, David)
January 27, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Risks, Ltd., Coastal Environmental Group, Dana Partnership LLP, Global Indemnity Insurance Agency, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Sterling Equipment, Inc., Triton Structural Concrete, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12301044 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons to All Risks, Ltd., #3 Proposed Summons to Coastal Environmental Group, #4 Proposed Summons to Dana Partnership LLP, #5 Proposed Summons to Global Indemnity Insurance Agency, Inc., #6 Proposed Summons to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, #7 Proposed Summons to Sterling Equipment, Inc., #8 Proposed Summons to Triton Structural Concrete, Inc.) (McTaggart, David)
January 27, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Edward R. Korman and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company v. Coastal Environmental Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Risks, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Partnership LLP
Represented By: Ted Poretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Indemnity Insurance Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Equipment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triton Structural Concrete, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Environmental Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aegis Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Theodore M.B Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: David Thomas McTaggart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?