Edmondson et al v. Raniere et al
Plaintiff: John Doe, Toni Natalie, Jane Doe, Sarah Edmondson and Mark Vicente
Defendant: Lauren Salzman, Dr. Danielle Roberts, Kathy Russell, Dr. Brandon Porter, NXIVM Corporation, Daniella Padilla Bergeron, Rosa Laura Junco, Loreta J. Garza Davila, Clare Bronfman, Monica Duran, Sara Bronfman-Igtet, Allison Mack, Ethical Science Foundation, Nancy Salzman, Karen Unterreiner, First Principles, Keith Raniere, Nicki Clyne and Executive Success Programs, Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv00485
Filed: January 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Steven M Gold
Referring Judge: Eric R Komitee
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Filing 52 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe(Nos. 1-17), Toni Natalie, Sarah Edmondson, Mark Vicente, Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60). Keith Raniere served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020. (Glazer, Neil)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting #34 Motion to Stay. No later than one business day after the date of the final adjudication in the trial court for the last defendant in U.S. v. Raniere, Plaintiffs shall file with this Court a Notice advising this Court and the Clerk of its occurrence. Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 3/3/2020. (Guy, Alicia)
March 3, 2020 Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eric R. Komitee: Status Conference held on 3/3/2020. On consent, the motion to stay was granted. (Court Reporter Anthony Frisolone.) (Guy, Alicia)
March 3, 2020 Filing 49 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe(Nos. 1-17), Toni Natalie, Sarah Edmondson, Mark Vicente, Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60). NXIVM Corporation served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (Glazer, Neil)
March 3, 2020 Filing 48 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe(Nos. 1-17), Toni Natalie, Sarah Edmondson, Mark Vicente, Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60). First Principles served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (Glazer, Neil)
March 3, 2020 Filing 47 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe(Nos. 1-17), Toni Natalie, Sarah Edmondson, Mark Vicente, Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60). Executive Success Programs, Inc served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (Glazer, Neil)
February 26, 2020 Filing 46 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Doe(Nos. 1-17), Toni Natalie, Sarah Edmondson, Mark Vicente, Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60). Karen Unterreiner waiver sent on 2/12/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Dean, Zahra)
February 26, 2020 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe(Nos. 1-17), Toni Natalie, Sarah Edmondson, Mark Vicente, Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60). Lauren Salzman served on 2/15/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Dean, Zahra)
February 25, 2020 Filing 44 Summons Issued as to Brandon Porter. (Guy, Alicia)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER re #34 Joint MOTION to Stay proceedings -- A status conference will be held on March 3, 2020, at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 6G North. Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 2/25/2020. (Guy, Alicia)
February 25, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Linz on behalf of Sara Bronfman-Igtet (notification declined or already on case) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Linz, Andrew)
February 25, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Sprinzen on behalf of Sara Bronfman-Igtet (notification declined or already on case) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Sprinzen, Nicole)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #39 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Andrew Linz shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 2/25/2020. (Gillespie, Saudia)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #37 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Nicole Sprinzen shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 2/25/2020. (Gillespie, Saudia)
February 25, 2020 Filing 41 APPLICATION #38 Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically Ordered by Clerk of Court on 2/25/2020. (Marziliano, August)
February 21, 2020 Filing 40 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60), John Doe(Nos. 1-17), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Sarah Edmondson, Toni Natalie, Mark Vicente (Glazer, Neil)
February 21, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew Linz, Esq.; $150, Receipt No.ANYEDC-12425965 by Sara Bronfman-Igtet. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Payment) (Lee, Tiffeny)
February 21, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by Sara Bronfman-Igtet. (Attachments: #1 Payment Confirmations) (Sprinzen, Nicole)
February 21, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Nicole Sprinzen, Esq.; $150, Receipt No. ANYEDC12422171 by Sara Bronfman-Igtet. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Payment) (Lee, Tiffeny)
February 20, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Bruce Maffeo on behalf of Sara Bronfman-Igtet (aty to be noticed) (Maffeo, J.)
February 20, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by John Joseph Sullivan on behalf of Sara Bronfman-Igtet (aty to be noticed) (Sullivan, John)
February 20, 2020 Filing 34 Joint MOTION to Stay proceedings by Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60), John Doe(Nos. 1-17), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Sarah Edmondson, Toni Natalie, Mark Vicente. (Dsouza, Zahra)
February 12, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Steingard on behalf of All Plaintiffs (notification declined or already on case) (Steingard, Steven)
February 12, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Hoese on behalf of Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60), John Doe(Nos. 1-17), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Sarah Edmondson, Toni Natalie, Mark Vicente (notification declined or already on case) (Hoese, William)
February 12, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig W. Hillwig on behalf of Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60), John Doe(Nos. 1-17), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Sarah Edmondson, Toni Natalie, Mark Vicente (notification declined or already on case) (Hillwig, Craig)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Steven M. Steingard shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150.00 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 2/11/2020. (Gillespie, Saudia)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney William E. Hoese shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150.00 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 2/11/2020. (Gillespie, Saudia)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Craig W. Hillwig shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150.00 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 2/11/2020. (Gillespie, Saudia)
February 11, 2020 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe(Nos. 1-17), Toni Natalie, Sarah Edmondson, Mark Vicente, Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60). Nancy Salzman served on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020. (Glazer, Neil)
February 10, 2020 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe(Nos. 1-17), Toni Natalie, Sarah Edmondson, Mark Vicente, Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60). Danielle Roberts served on 2/5/2020, answer due 2/26/2020. (Glazer, Neil)
February 10, 2020 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe(Nos. 1-17), Toni Natalie, Sarah Edmondson, Mark Vicente, Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60). Allison Mack served on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Glazer, Neil)
February 7, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Of Steven M. Steingard Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12357507. by Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60), John Doe(Nos. 1-17), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Sarah Edmondson, Toni Natalie, Mark Vicente. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice) (Steingard, Steven)
February 7, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12357430. by Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60), John Doe(Nos. 1-17), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Sarah Edmondson, Toni Natalie, Mark Vicente. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Hoese, William)
February 7, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12357427. by Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60), John Doe(Nos. 1-17), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Sarah Edmondson, Toni Natalie, Mark Vicente. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Hillwig, Craig)
February 6, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe(Nos. 1-17), Toni Natalie, Sarah Edmondson, Mark Vicente, Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60). Sara Bronfman-Igtet served on 2/6/2020, answer due 2/27/2020. (Glazer, Neil)
February 5, 2020 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to Sara Bronfman-Igtet, Ethical Science Foundation, Executive Success Programs, Inc, First Principles, NXIVM Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Ramesar, Thameera)
February 5, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Protective Order by Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60), John Doe(Nos. 1-17), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Sarah Edmondson, Toni Natalie, Mark Vicente. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Glazer, Neil)
February 5, 2020 Filing 21 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60), John Doe(Nos. 1-17), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Sarah Edmondson, Toni Natalie, Mark Vicente (Glazer, Neil)
February 3, 2020 Filing 20 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60), John Doe(Nos. 1-17), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Sarah Edmondson, Toni Natalie, Mark Vicente (Glazer, Neil)
February 3, 2020 Filing 19 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60), John Doe(Nos. 1-17), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Sarah Edmondson, Toni Natalie, Mark Vicente (Glazer, Neil)
February 3, 2020 Filing 18 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60), John Doe(Nos. 1-17), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Sarah Edmondson, Toni Natalie, Mark Vicente (Glazer, Neil)
February 3, 2020 Filing 17 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60), John Doe(Nos. 1-17), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Sarah Edmondson, Toni Natalie, Mark Vicente (Glazer, Neil)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Aarthi Manohar shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150.00 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 2/3/2020. (Gillespie, Saudia)
January 31, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12322652. by Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60), John Doe(Nos. 1-17), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Sarah Edmondson, Toni Natalie, Mark Vicente. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Manohar, Aarthi)
January 29, 2020 Filing 14 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60), John Doe(Nos. 1-17), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Sarah Edmondson, Toni Natalie, Mark Vicente (Glazer, Neil)
January 29, 2020 Filing 13 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60), John Doe(Nos. 1-17), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Sarah Edmondson, Toni Natalie, Mark Vicente (Glazer, Neil)
January 29, 2020 Filing 12 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60), John Doe(Nos. 1-17), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Sarah Edmondson, Toni Natalie, Mark Vicente (Glazer, Neil)
January 29, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60), John Doe(Nos. 1-17), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Sarah Edmondson, Toni Natalie, Mark Vicente (Glazer, Neil)
January 29, 2020 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60), John Doe(Nos. 1-17), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Sarah Edmondson, Toni Natalie, Mark Vicente (Glazer, Neil)
January 29, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60), John Doe(Nos. 1-17), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Sarah Edmondson, Toni Natalie, Mark Vicente (Glazer, Neil)
January 29, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60), John Doe(Nos. 1-17), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Sarah Edmondson, Toni Natalie, Mark Vicente (Glazer, Neil)
January 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Aitan David Goelman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Goelman, Aitan)
January 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen H. Schwartz on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Schwartz, Stephen)
January 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Zahra R. Dsouza on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Dsouza, Zahra)
January 29, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 29, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 28, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12308763 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by John Doe(Nos. 1-17), Toni Natalie, Sarah Edmondson, Mark Vicente, Jane Doe(Nos. 1 to 13), John Doe(Nos. 19-20), Jane Doe(Nos. 15-39), Jane Doe(Nos. 41-60). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Glazer, Neil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edmondson et al v. Raniere et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Danielle Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Brandon Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NXIVM Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniella Padilla Bergeron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosa Laura Junco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loreta J. Garza Davila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clare Bronfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Bronfman-Igtet
Represented By: John Joseph Sullivan
Represented By: Nicole Sprinzen
Represented By: J. Bruce Maffeo
Represented By: Andrew Linz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethical Science Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Unterreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Principles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Raniere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicki Clyne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Success Programs, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Neil L. Glazer
Represented By: Aitan David Goelman
Represented By: Craig W. Hillwig
Represented By: William E. Hoese
Represented By: Aarthi Manohar
Represented By: Steven M. Steingard
Represented By: Zahra Dean
Represented By: Stephen H. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni Natalie
Represented By: Neil L. Glazer
Represented By: Aitan David Goelman
Represented By: Craig W. Hillwig
Represented By: William E. Hoese
Represented By: Aarthi Manohar
Represented By: Steven M. Steingard
Represented By: Zahra Dean
Represented By: Stephen H. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Neil L. Glazer
Represented By: Aitan David Goelman
Represented By: Craig W. Hillwig
Represented By: William E. Hoese
Represented By: Aarthi Manohar
Represented By: Steven M. Steingard
Represented By: Zahra Dean
Represented By: Stephen H. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Edmondson
Represented By: Neil L. Glazer
Represented By: Aitan David Goelman
Represented By: Craig W. Hillwig
Represented By: William E. Hoese
Represented By: Aarthi Manohar
Represented By: Steven M. Steingard
Represented By: Zahra Dean
Represented By: Stephen H. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Vicente
Represented By: Neil L. Glazer
Represented By: Aitan David Goelman
Represented By: Craig W. Hillwig
Represented By: William E. Hoese
Represented By: Aarthi Manohar
Represented By: Steven M. Steingard
Represented By: Zahra Dean
Represented By: Stephen H. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?