McKie v. The Estate of Doris Dickinson et al
Plaintiff: Christopher McKie
Defendant: Charles Kornegay, The Estate of Doris Dickinson and Peggy Kornegay
Case Number: 1:2020cv01050
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 6/16/2020 @ 11:45 AM before Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Telephone conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 11:45 AM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 20-1050. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 4/29/2020. (Caggiano, Diana)
April 27, 2020 Filing 7 Plaintiff's Compliance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Service Requirement by Christopher McKie. (Herrera, Isaiah)
March 24, 2020 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #5 : Motion for Extension of Time. Answer by May 15, 2020. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 3/24/2020. (Hazelwood, John)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William V. DeCandido on behalf of Charles Kornegay (aty to be noticed) (DeCandido, William)
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or otherwise move until May 15, 2020 by The Estate of Doris Dickinson. (DeCandido, William)
March 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William V. DeCandido on behalf of The Estate of Doris Dickinson (aty to be noticed) (DeCandido, William)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 2, 2020 FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number 4653148538 (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charles Kornegay, Peggy Kornegay, The Estate of Doris Dickinson, filed by Christopher McKie. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKie v. The Estate of Doris Dickinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Kornegay
Represented By: William V. DeCandido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Doris Dickinson
Represented By: William V. DeCandido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy Kornegay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?