Brown v. American Airlines Group Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Shirley Brown
Defendant: American Airlines Group Inc., American Airlines, Inc. and Jane Doe
Case Number: 1:2020cv01092
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The telephone initial conference previously scheduled for April 6, 2020 is rescheduled for May 6, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 3/24/2020. (Gutmann, Joseph)
March 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Adjourn Conference by American Airlines Group Inc., American Airlines, Inc.. (Chan, Alice)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(a), I order the parties to attend an initial discovery planning conference on April 6, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. that will take place telephonically. The call-in information for the telephone conference is 1-877-336-1839 and the access code is 391-4302. I respectfully direct all counsel to call in to the telephone conference five minutes before the conference begins. If any party has any difficulty accessing the telephone conference, please contact chambers at Orenstein_Chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov. No later than April 2, 2020, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF (Electronic Case Filing) system, a joint proposed discovery plan. Each party's counsel must be personally prepared to discuss all factual and legal issues in the case, including the possibility of settlement; otherwise, the client must attend in person as well. SEE ATTACHED ORDER.Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 3/17/2020. (Almonte, Kelly)
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Martin Arnold on behalf of Shirley Brown (aty to be noticed) (Arnold, Charles)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
March 5, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Airlines Group Inc., American Airlines, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,, #2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet (Chan, Alice)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,, by American Airlines Group Inc., American Airlines, Inc. (Chan, Alice)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Airlines Group Inc., American Airlines, Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Queens, case number 706805/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12459227) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit New York State Department of State Letter, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit Stipulation, #5 Exhibit Amended Summons and Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit Plaintiff's Affidavit of Service of Amended Summons and Amended Complaint on American Airlines, Inc., #7 Exhibit Plaintiff's Affidavit of Service of Amended Summons and Amended Complaint on American Airlines Group Inc., #8 Exhibit American Airlines, Inc. Answer Answer to Amended Complaint, #9 Exhibit American Airlines Group Inc. Answer to Amended Complaint, #10 Exhibit Defendants' Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars, #11 Exhibit Defendants' CPLR 3017(c) Supplemental Demand Request, #12 Exhibit Preliminary Conference Order, #13 Exhibit Plaintiff's Supplemental Response to Combined Demands, #14 Exhibit Plaintiff's Supplemental Bill of Particulars, #15 Exhibit Plaintiff's Response to Demand Pursuant to CPLR 3017(c), #16 Exhibit Defendants' Request for Judicial Intervention and Request for Preliminary Conference, #17 Exhibit Plaintiff's Verified Bill of Particulars, #18 Exhibit Plaintiff's Response to Combined Demands, #19 Exhibit Defendants' Notice Motion to Compel, #20 Exhibit Defendants' Withdrawal of Notice of Motion to Compel) (Chan, Alice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. American Airlines Group Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Brown
Represented By: Charles Martin Arnold
Represented By: Jacob Louis Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines Group Inc.
Represented By: Alice Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Alice Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?