Beci v. Turkish Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joris Beci
Defendant: Turkish Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01231
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Plaintiff, with defendant's consent, requests an adjournment of the May 5, 2020 conference. The request is granted. The Court adjourns the conference until May 21, 2020 at 3:30 p.m. The parties shall call the Chambers telephone conference line at (888) 363-4734 and use the access code 4444221 promptly at 3:30 p.m. The parties shall exchange their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures and file a 26(f) Meeting Report by May 14, 2020. Plaintiff shall execute releases for all medical and/or mental health treatment related to this incident to defendant's counsel by May 14, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 4/29/2020. (Panjini, Madhura)
April 28, 2020 Filing 12 First MOTION to Adjourn Conference plaintiff by Joris Beci. (Fedrizzi, Linda)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court shall hold the initial conference by telephone in plaintiff's case on May 5, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. The parties shall call the Chambers telephone conference line at (888) 363-4734 and use the access code 4444221 promptly at 11:00 a.m. on May 5, 2020. The parties shall exchange their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures and file a 26(f) Meeting Report by April 28, 2020. As this is a personal injury case, plaintiff shall execute releases for all medical and/or mental health treatment related to this incident to defendant's counsel by April 28, 2020. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 4/10/2020. (Panjini, Madhura)
April 9, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom for all further proceedings. Judge Brian M. Cogan no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Guzzi, Roseann)
April 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Turkish Airlines, Inc. (Carlsen, Christopher)
April 8, 2020 Filing 9 Letter by Turkish Airlines, Inc. (Carlsen, Christopher)
April 1, 2020 Set/Reset Hearing: Initial Status Conference previously set for 4/20/2020 is reset to 4/21/2020 at 12:00 pm and will be held by telephone. The parties are directed to use the toll-free number 888-684-8852 and access code 6427877# to participate in the call and are reminded to comply with the mandatory requirements set forth at #7 and shall ECF file a completed case management prior to the conference. (Weisberg, Peggy)
March 30, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Turkish Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.1 Statement) (Carlsen, Christopher)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 4/20/2020 at 10:45 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. In addition, plaintiff is directed to serve on defendant a complete set of medical authorizations and HIPAA releases together with the summons and complaint. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/9/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy)
March 9, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Turkish Airlines, Inc.. (Barrett, C)
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Barrett, C)
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Barrett, C)
March 9, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Barrett, C)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet. Re #1 Complaint by Joris Beci. (Fedrizzi, Linda) (Barrett, C) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Civil Cover Sheet. Re #1 Complaint by Joris Beci. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fedrizzi, Linda) (Barrett, C) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Joris Beci against Turkish Airlines, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12495930 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Joris Beci. (Fedrizzi, Linda) Modified on 3/9/2020 (Barrett, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beci v. Turkish Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joris Beci
Represented By: Linda F. Fedrizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turkish Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Carlsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?