Jones et al v. Stanford et al
Plaintiff: Vernon Jones, Thomas Mitchell, Compton Mohabir, Corydon Umber, Douglas Hyson and Vladimir Krull
Defendant: Tina M. Stanford and Anthony Annucci
Case Number: 1:2020cv01332
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Raymond J Dearie
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce Jay Turkle on behalf of Anthony Annucci, Tina M. Stanford (aty to be noticed) (Turkle, Bruce)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial/telephone conference will be held at 11:30 AM on 6/05/2020 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara. The parties are directed to call the toll-free number 877-336-1274. The access code is 6534420. The parties shall dial in five (5) minutes before the 11:30 AM conference. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 6/05/2020. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 5/1/2020. (Manson, Eddie)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: The stipulation and motion for extension of time to answer #8 is granted. Defendants shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 6/1/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 4/28/2020. (Ferrara, Anthony)
April 27, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Service and Time to Answer by Douglas Hyson, Vernon Jones, Vladimir Krull, Thomas Mitchell, Compton Mohabir, Corydon Umber (Biklen, Molly) Modified on 4/28/2020 (to add motion) (Ferrara, Anthony).
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corydon Umber, Thomas Mitchell, Vernon Jones, Vladimir Krull, Douglas Hyson, Compton Mohabir. Anthony Annucci served on 3/25/2020, answer due 4/15/2020; Tina M. Stanford served on 3/25/2020, answer due 4/15/2020. (Biklen, Molly)
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anthony Annucci, Tina M. Stanford. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued) (Tavarez, Jennifer)
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Douglas Hyson, Vernon Jones, Vladimir Krull, Thomas Mitchell, Compton Mohabir, Corydon Umber (Biklen, Molly)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Douglas Hyson, Vernon Jones, Vladimir Krull, Thomas Mitchell, Compton Mohabir, Corydon Umber (Biklen, Molly)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Barrett, C)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Barrett, C)
March 16, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Raymond J. Dearie and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Barrett, C)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 400 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Corydon Umber, Thomas Mitchell, Vernon Jones, Vladimir Krull, Douglas Hyson, Compton Mohabir. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Biklen, Molly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Stanford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon Jones
Represented By: Molly Knopp Biklen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Mitchell
Represented By: Molly Knopp Biklen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Compton Mohabir
Represented By: Molly Knopp Biklen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corydon Umber
Represented By: Molly Knopp Biklen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Hyson
Represented By: Molly Knopp Biklen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vladimir Krull
Represented By: Molly Knopp Biklen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina M. Stanford
Represented By: Bruce Jay Turkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Annucci
Represented By: Bruce Jay Turkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?