Al Zinnah v. Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack Of Delaware, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sikder Al Zinnah
Defendant: Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack Of Delaware, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01544
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Referring Judge: Allyne R Ross
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 ELECTRONIC ORDER re #9 : The Court endorses the stipulation. Response to the Complaint by May 27, 2020. Motion by June 29, 2020. The initial conference previously scheduled for 5/13/2020 is adjourned sine die. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 4/24/2020. (Hazelwood, John)
April 21, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to the Complaint and Plaintiff's Time to Move to Remand by Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack Of Delaware, Inc. (Capobianco, Matthew)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: An Telephone Initial Conference is set for 5/13/2020 @ 10:15 AM before Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. The telephone initial conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 10:15 AM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 20-1544. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 4/7/2020. (Caggiano, Diana)
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Marie Griffith on behalf of Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack Of Delaware, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Griffith, Lisa)
March 26, 2020 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
March 26, 2020 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
March 26, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack Of Delaware, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Icahn Enterprises L.P. for Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack Of Delaware, Inc.. (Capobianco, Matthew)
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack Of Delaware, Inc. (Capobianco, Matthew)
March 25, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack Of Delaware, Inc. (Capobianco, Matthew)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack Of Delaware, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12589334) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Capobianco, Matthew)
March 25, 2020 Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information.-Please file the Notice of Removal, A Completed 2 Page Form (Not the Instructions)Civil Cover Sheet and pay the Civil Filing Fee for the following case so it may be processed. (Davis, Kimberly)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack Of Delaware, Inc. (Capobianco, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al Zinnah v. Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack Of Delaware, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sikder Al Zinnah
Represented By: Abdul Karim Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack Of Delaware, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew R. Capobianco
Represented By: Lisa Marie Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?