Grinblat v. Speedway LLC et al
Plaintiff: Semyon Grinblat
Defendant: Speedway LLC, Hess Retail Stores LLC, John Doe 1-X and Corporations 1-X
Case Number: 1:2020cv01643
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER. Plaintiff is ordered to respond to defendant Speedway LLC's #14 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Monday, June 1, 2020 at noon . Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 5/28/2020. (Zhang, Grace)
May 28, 2020 Filing 14 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re #5 Amended Complaint by Speedway LLC. (Lyons, John)
May 8, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Semyon Grinblat. Speedway LLC served on 5/4/2020, answer due 5/28/2020. (Grinblat, Michael)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 7/8/2020 @ 2:15 PM before Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Telephone conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 2:15 PM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 20-1643. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 4/28/2020. (Caggiano, Diana)
April 28, 2020 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Speedway LLC to answer, move, or otherwise respond by 5/28/2020. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 4/28/2020. (Phillips, Lauren)
April 24, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Complaint by Speedway LLC. (Lyons, John)
April 24, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Speedway LLC identifying Corporate Parent MPC Investment LLC, Corporate Parent Marathon Petroleum Corporation for Speedway LLC. (Lyons, John)
April 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John Michael Lyons on behalf of Speedway LLC (aty to be noticed) (Lyons, John)
April 12, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Semyon Grinblat. Speedway LLC served on 4/7/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (Grinblat, Michael)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO HESS RETAIL STORES LLC: Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 4/6/2020. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
April 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Semyon Grinblat of Hess Retail Stores LLC (Grinblat, Michael)
April 5, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Semyon Grinblat. (Grinblat, Michael)
April 1, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Speedway LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 1, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12617336 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Semyon Grinblat. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Speedway LLC et al., #2 Proposed Summons Speedway LLC) (Grinblat, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grinblat v. Speedway LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Represented By: John Michael Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Retail Stores LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporations 1-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Semyon Grinblat
Represented By: Michael Grinblat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?