Ramirez v. New Giant Laundry Center Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Beatriz Ramirez
Defendant: New Giant Laundry Center Inc., James Changho Park and Grace Park
Case Number: 1:2020cv01697
Filed: April 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William F Kuntz
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beatriz Ramirez. New Giant Laundry Center Inc. served on 4/7/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (Stillman, Lina)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 4, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to James Changho Park, New Giant Laundry Center Inc., Grace Park. (Attachments: #1 James summons, #2 Grace summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 4, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 4, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Beatriz Ramirez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Summons New Giant Laundromat Inc, #2 Exhibit Proposed Summons James Park, #3 Exhibit Proposed Summons Grace Park) (Stillman, Lina)
April 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Changho Park, New Giant Laundry Center Inc., Grace Park filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12634513 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Beatriz Ramirez. (Stillman, Lina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. New Giant Laundry Center Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Giant Laundry Center Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Changho Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatriz Ramirez
Represented By: Lina Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?