Kalfus v. Presbyterian Journal Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert Kalfus
Defendant: Presbyterian Journal Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01875
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 CASE: 1:20-cv-01875 DETAILS: Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in Southern District of New York as case 1:20-cv-04601, filed 06/16/2020. (Marziliano, August)
June 16, 2020 Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in Southern District of New York as case 1:20-cv-04601, filed 06/16/2020. (Lee, Tiffeny)
June 16, 2020 Case transferred to District of Southern District of New York. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Lee, Tiffeny)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Stipulation Regarding Transfer of Venue, The parties agree to transfer venue of the Action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Plaintiff shall amend it complaint to add in the correct Defendant's name within seven (7) days after the Southern District of New York opens and assigns a docket number to this matter. Defendant shall file its response or answer to the Complaint within seven (7) days after the amended complaint is filed.So Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 6/4/2020. (Please note Rule 83.1 has not been waived and the case will be transferred after seven (7) days.) (Lee, Tiffeny)
June 3, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION to transfer Venue by Robert Kalfus (Liebowitz, Richard)
May 31, 2020 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Presbyterian Journal Co., Inc.. (Pedro, Verne)
May 28, 2020 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Verne Alan Pedro substituted for attorney Kathryn Mary Carney Cole (now terminated from the matter). So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 5/28/2020. (Phillips, Lauren)
May 27, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Presbyterian Journal Co., Inc.. (Pedro, Verne)
May 14, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Presbyterian Journal Co., Inc.. Presbyterian Journal Co., Inc. waiver sent on 5/13/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (Carney Cole, Kathryn)
May 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Mary Carney Cole on behalf of Presbyterian Journal Co., Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Carney Cole, Kathryn)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Presbyterian Journal Co., Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
April 22, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Presbyterian Journal Co., Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number BNYEDC-12704207 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Robert Kalfus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kalfus v. Presbyterian Journal Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Kalfus
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Presbyterian Journal Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?