Meadowcroft v. Saul
Plaintiff: Gerard Meadowcroft
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv01913
Filed: April 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gerard Meadowcroft. Andrew Saul served on 5/8/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. (DeHaan, John)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Zeigler on behalf of Andrew Saul (aty to be noticed) (Zeigler, Anne)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall for all further proceedings. Judge Eric N. Vitaliano no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 4/27/2020. (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Sica, Michele) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/8/2020) (Brown, Marc).
April 27, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Sica, Michele)
April 27, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Sica, Michele)
April 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Gerard Meadowcroft against Andrew Saul filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12720785 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Gerard Meadowcroft. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (DeHaan, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meadowcroft v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard Meadowcroft
Represented By: John W. DeHaan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?