Jaber v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Mohammed Fahmi Jaber
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv02035
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Zeigler on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (aty to be noticed) (Zeigler, Anne)
May 13, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Courtesy copies of the Summons, the Court's 5/13/2020 Order and Plaintiff's Complaint sent to the United States Attorney General; United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York; and General Counsel at SSA.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff, pro se, is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's Complaint and this Order to the United States Marshal for the Eastern District of New York for service on Defendant, without prepayment of fees. Defendant shall file the administrative record, which will constitute Defendants answer, or otherwise move against the complaint by August 3, 2020. Defendant shall file and serve a motion for judgment on the pleadings, which must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and administrative record, by October 2, 2020; Plaintiff shall file and serve a response to Defendant's motion, and any cross-motion, by December 1, 2020; and Defendant shall file and serve its reply, if any, by December 22, 2020. The parties are to comply in all respects with applicable Local Rules for this district and this Courts Individual Practices and Rules, including but not limited to the Court's Individual Practice and Rules 1(D) and (C) regarding proper courtesy copy procedure and legal memorandum pages limitations (i.e., 25 pages for opening and opposition briefs, and 10 pages for reply briefs). The parties are reminded to ensure all legal memoranda includes citations to the record. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 5/13/2020. (Greene, Donna)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly for all further proceedings. Judge Eric N. Vitaliano no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 5/12/2020. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mohammed Fahmi Jaber. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Mohammed Fahmi Jaber. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaber v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed Fahmi Jaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?