Valley Electronics AG et al v. Polis
Plaintiff: Valley Electronics GmbH, Valley Electronics AG and Valley Electronics, LLC
Defendant: Chelsea B. Polis
Case Number: 1:2020cv02133
Filed: May 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Allyne R Ross
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #22 Clerk's Judgment, #21 Order on Motion to Dismiss, by Valley Electronics AG, Valley Electronics GmbH, Valley Electronics, LLC. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ANYEDC-14799879. (Avrith, Charles)
August 31, 2021 Electronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals. #23 Notice of Appeal Documents are available via Pacer. For docket entries without a hyperlink or for documents under seal, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (Jones, Vasean)
August 9, 2021 Filing 22 CLERK'S JUDGMENT dated 8/9/21 that defendant's motion to dismiss is granted; and that plaintiffs' claims are dismissed. ( Ordered by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court on 8/9/2021 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons set forth in the attached Opinion & Order, defendant's #17 motion to dismiss is granted, and plaintiffs' claims are dismissed. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 8/6/2021.
March 24, 2021 Filing 20 Letter of Supplmental Authority by Valley Electronics AG, Valley Electronics GmbH, Valley Electronics, LLC (Ross, Peter)
March 9, 2021 Filing 19 Letter of Supplemental Authority by Chelsea B. Polis (Hanswirth, Dori)
September 4, 2020 Filing 18 Letter requesting oral argument on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by Valley Electronics AG, Valley Electronics GmbH, Valley Electronics, LLC (Avrith, Charles)
September 3, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Chelsea B. Polis. (Attachments: #1 1-Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 2-Appendices in Support of Motion to Dismiss,, #3 3-Declaration of Paul Q. Andrews, #4 4-Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #5 5-Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss, #6 6-Supplemental Declaration of Paul Q. Andrews in further support) (Hanswirth, Dori)
September 1, 2020 Filing 16 Letter enclosing Plaintiffs' Memorandum In Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, dated August 27, 2020 by Valley Electronics AG, Valley Electronics GmbH, Valley Electronics, LLC (Avrith, Charles)
August 13, 2020 Filing 15 Letter enclosing motion to dismiss and supporting papers by Chelsea B. Polis (Andrews, Paul)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, granting Charles Avrith, Esq.'s #13 Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice. The admitted attorney Charles Avrith is permitted to argue or try this in whole or in part as counsel for Valley Electronics AG, Valley Electronics GmbH, and Valley Electronics, LLC. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 7/31/2020. (The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: After reviewing the parties' pre-motion letters #11 and #12 regarding defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss, I have concluded a pre-motion conference is not necessary. The motion shall be briefed as follows: defendant's motion and supporting papers are to be served by August 13, 2020; plaintiffs' response is to be served by August 27, 2020; and defendant's reply, if any, is to be served by September 3, 2020. The fully briefed motion shall be filed in accordance with chambers rules, including courtesy copies for chambers, no later than September 3, 2020. This schedule may be altered only with the permission of the court. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 7/30/2020. (Pehrsson, Emily)
July 29, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Charles Avrith Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13134473. by Valley Electronics AG, Valley Electronics GmbH, Valley Electronics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Charles Avrith ISO Motion to Admit Counsel, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Attachment to Affidavit of Charles Avrith ISO Motion to Admit Counsel) (Avrith, Charles)
July 17, 2020 Filing 12 Letter Response Letter to Defendant's July 8, 2020 Letter Requesting a Pre-Motion Conference by Valley Electronics AG, Valley Electronics GmbH, Valley Electronics, LLC (Ross, Peter)
July 8, 2020 Filing 11 Letter requesting a pre-motion conference by Chelsea B. Polis (Hanswirth, Dori)
July 8, 2020 NOTICE: Defendant has submitted a letter requesting a pre-motion conference regarding an anticipated motion to dismiss. Plaintiffs' counsel is reminded that, under Judge Ross's Individual Motion Practices, Plaintiffs are required to file a responsive letter addressing the legal and factual bases of the anticipated motion within seven business days from service of Defendant's letter, on or before July 17, 2020. (Pehrsson, Emily)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendant, with plaintiffs' consent, requests an extension of time to respond to plaintiffs' complaint. ECF No. 9. The request is granted. Defendant shall respond to plaintiffs' complaint by July 10, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 6/1/2020. (Panjini, Madhura)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, granting Plaintiffs' Attorney's #6 Notice of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice: The admitted attorney Peter W.Ross, a member of the firm of Browne George Ross LLP and a member in good standing of the bar(s) of the State(s) of California, as attorney pro hac vice is permitted to argue or try this particular case in whole or in part as counsel for Valley Electronics AG, Valley Electronics GmbH, and Valley Electronics, LLC. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 5/29/2020. (The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
May 29, 2020 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Chelsea B. Polis. (Andrews, Paul)
May 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Quigley Andrews on behalf of Chelsea B. Polis (aty to be noticed) (Andrews, Paul)
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Dori Ann Hanswirth on behalf of Chelsea B. Polis (aty to be noticed) (Hanswirth, Dori)
May 27, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12845970. by Valley Electronics AG, Valley Electronics GmbH, Valley Electronics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support Notice of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Attachment 1 to Affidavit - Certificate of Good Standing - State Court, #3 Exhibit Attachment 2 to Affidavit - Certificate of Good Standing - Supreme Court) (Ross, Peter)
May 19, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Valley Electronics AG, Valley Electronics, LLC, Valley Electronics GmbH. Chelsea B. Polis served on 5/15/2020, answer due 6/5/2020. (Mitchell, Jeffrey)
May 12, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Chelsea B. Polis. (Sica, Michele)
May 12, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Sica, Michele)
May 12, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Sica, Michele)
May 12, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Sica, Michele)
May 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chelsea B. Polis filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12781604 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Valley Electronics AG, Valley Electronics, LLC, Valley Electronics GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Mitchell, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valley Electronics AG et al v. Polis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsea B. Polis
Represented By: Paul Quigley Andrews
Represented By: Dori Ann Hanswirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley Electronics GmbH
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mitchell
Represented By: Peter Wayne Ross
Represented By: Charles Avrith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley Electronics AG
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mitchell
Represented By: Peter Wayne Ross
Represented By: Charles Avrith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley Electronics, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mitchell
Represented By: Peter Wayne Ross
Represented By: Charles Avrith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?