United States of America v. One Cuniform Tablet Known as the "Gilgamesh Dream Tablet"
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: One Cuniform Tablet Known as the "Gilgamesh Dream Tablet"
Claimant: Hobby Lobby Stores Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02222
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Hobby Lobby Stores Inc.. (McCullough, Michael)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RESPECTFULLY REFERRING CASE. Case respectfully referred to Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo for pre-trial management. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 7/10/2020. (Greene, Donna)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America direct notice letter sent to potential claimant on May 20, 2020 (Orenstein, Karin)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America Affidavit of publication, legal notice was given on the official government website www.forfeiture.gov, beginning on May 21st and ending on June 20th (Orenstein, Karin)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sylvia Shweder on behalf of United States of America (aty to be noticed) (Shweder, Sylvia)
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Anju Uchima on behalf of Hobby Lobby Stores Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Uchima, Anju)
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Duncan Patrick Levin on behalf of Hobby Lobby Stores Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Levin, Duncan)
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 CLAIM Forfeiture by Hobby Lobby Stores Inc.. (McCullough, Michael)
May 19, 2020 Filing 3 WARRANT OF ARREST OF ARTICLE IN REM. (Greene, Donna)
May 18, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ONE CUNEIFORM TABLET KNOWN AS THE "GILGAMESH DREAM TABLET" Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Warrant for Arrest of Article in Rem) (Orenstein, Karin)
May 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Sica, Michele)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. One Cuniform Tablet Known as the "Gilgamesh Dream Tablet"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Cuniform Tablet Known as the "Gilgamesh Dream Tablet"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Karin K. Orenstein
Represented By: Sylvia Shweder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Hobby Lobby Stores Inc.
Represented By: Michael Joseph McCullough
Represented By: Anju Uchima
Represented By: Duncan Patrick Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?