Stewart v. Caribbean Airlines Limited et al
Plaintiff: Andy Stewart
Defendant: ABM Aviation, Inc., Global Elite Group Inc., Port Authority Of New York And New Jersey, Caribbean Airlines Limited, Global Security Associates LLC and ABM Janitorial Services - Northeast, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02225
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Pamela K Chen
Referring Judge: Steven M Gold
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 12 Minute Entry: Telephone Conference held on 6/25/2020 before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Curtis for plaintiff, Maggio for Caribbean, Oh for ABM, Bizzaro for Global defendants. Plaintiff will attempt to accomplish service on defendant Port Authority. Discovery will be limited to document demands and production, including production by plaintiff of authorizations to obtain medical records, between now and the appearance of all parties. THE COURT WILL HOLD A FURTHER TELEPHONE CONFERENCE AT 11:00 AM ON SEPTEMBER 9, 2020. Each party is directed to call the following conference number: 877-336-1839 and use access code 3482793. (Gillespie, Saudia)
June 23, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Scheduling Order by Andy Stewart (Curtis, Justin)
June 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel L. Levine on behalf of Andy Stewart (aty to be noticed) (Levine, Joel)
June 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Lawrence Wiss on behalf of Andy Stewart (aty to be noticed) (Wiss, Scott)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic-initial conference will be held on June 25, 2020 at 12:00 p.m. before the undersigned. Counsel for all parties must participate. Counsel shall confer with each other, complete the attached initial conference questionnaire and electronically file two days prior to the conference. Each party is directed to call the following conference number: 877-336-1839 and use access code 3482793. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 5/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Individual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia)
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Stephen Curtis on behalf of Andy Stewart (aty to be noticed) (Curtis, Justin)
May 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Bizzaro on behalf of Global Elite Group Inc., Global Security Associates LLC (aty to be noticed) (Bizzaro, Matthew)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by ABM Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Oh, John)
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Caribbean Airlines Limited. (Maggio, John)
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 18, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Caribbean Airlines Limited from Supreme Court, Queens County, case number 7021843/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (Maggio, John)
May 18, 2020 FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12808940 (Davis, Kimberly)
May 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Caribbean Airlines Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Stewart
Represented By: Anthony A. Ferrante
Represented By: Joel L. Levine
Represented By: Scott Lawrence Wiss
Represented By: Justin Stephen Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABM Aviation, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Oh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Elite Group Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Bizzaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Port Authority Of New York And New Jersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caribbean Airlines Limited
Represented By: John Maggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Security Associates LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Bizzaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABM Janitorial Services - Northeast, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Oh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?