Best v. New York City Police Department Sex Offender Unit
Petitioner: Hillary Best
Respondent: New York City Police Department Sex Offender Unit
Case Number: 1:2020cv02382
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: William F Kuntz
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-03218. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 28, 2020 Mailed a copy of #3 Order to Hillary Best, P.O. Box 751072, Queens, NY 11375.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Mailed a copy of #3 Order, to Hillary Best P.O. Box 751072 Queens, NY 11375. (sbr) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Hillary Best dated 5/11/2020 re: Please be advised that I am in receipt of a copy of your order dated April 23, 2020, ruling that I, the petitioner, submitted my petition for a writ of habeas corpus without the filing fee or an IFP application, which is incorrect, in that I did submit with my petition for habeas corpus a money order in the sum of $5.00 (see copy of same attached hereto). Document filed by Hillary Best.(ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court. Transmitted re: #3 Order,,,, to the Office of the Clerk of Court for processing..(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Petitioner and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. This order closes the case in the Southern District of New York. Because Petitioner has not at this time made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right, a certificate of appealability will not issue under 28 U.S.C. 2253.2 The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 44445 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/21/20) (rdz) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Mailed a copy of #2 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application, Hillary Best, P.O. Box 751072, Queens, NY 11375.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/29/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Pro Se Payment of Fee Processed: Money Order processed by the Finance Department on 4/22/2020, Receipt Number 465401257739. (rw) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/29/2020.]
April 24, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/29/2020.]
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Petitioner is directed to render payment of the $5.00 filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 5/26/2020. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 5/26/2020. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/23/2020) (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (keb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/29/2020.]
April 23, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/29/2020.]
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Document filed by Hillary Best.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/29/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Best v. New York City Police Department Sex Offender Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hillary Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: New York City Police Department Sex Offender Unit
Represented By: QUEENS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE - GENERIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?