Feng v. Toyota Motor North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tina Feng
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor North America Inc. and Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02493
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William F Kuntz
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall abide by the following briefing schedule regarding Plaintiffs' motion for transfer of actions to the Eastern District of Michigan, 20-CV-629, ECF No. 57 , and Plaintiffs' Motion for Consolidation, 20-CV-629, ECF No. 61 : 1. The Plaintiffs shall re-serve the motions with any amendments on the Defendants on or before Friday, August 28, 2020; 2.The Defendants shall serve any opposition to Plaintiffs' motions on or before Friday, October 2, 2020; 3.The Plaintiffs shall serve any reply to the Defendants' opposition on or before Friday, October 30, 2020, by 5:00 P.M. As a courtesy to the Court, the Court requests the parties refrain from filing motion papers until the motion has been fully briefed. If the parties elect to file their motion only once it is fully briefed, the notice of motion and all supporting papers are to be served on the other party along with a cover letter setting forth whom the movant represents and the papers being served. Only a copy of the cover letter shall be electronically filed in advance of the fully briefed motion, and it must be filed as a letter, not as a motion. On the day the motion is fully briefed, each party shall electronically file their individual motion papers by 5:00 P.M. on October 30, 2020. Plaintiffs shall also mail a complete set of courtesy copies of all motion papers, via overnight mail, to the Court, attention of Ms. Alexis Love. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 7/10/2020. (Love, Alexis).
June 26, 2020 Case Consolidated. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00629-WFK-CLP, 1:20-cv-02450-WFK-CLP, 1:20-cv-02493-WFK-CLP. (Love, Alexis)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 55 Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:20-cv-00629-WFK-CLP. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 6/26/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00629-WFK-CLP, 1:20-cv-02450-WFK-CLP and 1:20-cv-02493-WFK-CLP. (Love, Alexis)
June 26, 2020 Cases associated. (Love, Alexis)
June 25, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Nelson on behalf of Tina Feng (notification declined or already on case) (Nelson, John)
June 25, 2020 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 6/25/2020. (Phillips, Lauren)
June 24, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12973280. by Tina Feng. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing) (Nelson, John)
June 19, 2020 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond by 7/27/2020. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 6/19/2020. (Phillips, Lauren)
June 18, 2020 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Hooper, John)
June 18, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric F. Gladbach on behalf of Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Gladbach, Eric)
June 11, 2020 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #7 : The Court denies the motion without prejudice to renew, and directs counsel to the local rules of this District for instructions on submitting motions to appear Pro Hac Vice, if needed. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 6/11/2020. (Phillips, Lauren)
June 4, 2020 Filing 15 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 4, 2020 The case of Feng v. Toyota Motor North America, Inc et al, has been transferred from Southern District of California to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 20-cv-2493. PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 4, 2020 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:20-cv-00534. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue (Doc. No. #12 ). Case transferred to District of United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Files transferred electronically to: *District of United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York*.*225 Cadman Plaza East, Room 118S**Brooklyn, NY 11201-1818*. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 6/3/20. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (jmo) [Transferred from California Southern on 6/4/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Change Venue by Tina Feng. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities ISO Motion to Transfer, #2 Proposed Order)(Nelson, John) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/4/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Tina Feng of case(s) 20-cv-00629; 20-cv-01867; 8:20-cv-00775 . (Nelson, John) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/4/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of John Peter Hooper (Re: ECF No. #7 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 4/20/2020.(jrd) [Transferred from California Southern on 6/4/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint [Doc. No. #8 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 4/20/2020. (anh) [Transferred from California Southern on 6/4/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, USA, Inc.. (Shortnacy, Michael) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/4/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-13760834.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Hooper, John) (rmc). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/4/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Corporate Parent Toyota Motor Corporation for Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc... (Shortnacy, Michael) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/4/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Toyota Motor Sales, USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Corporate Parent Toyota Motor Corporation for Toyota Motor Sales, USA, Inc... (Shortnacy, Michael) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/4/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Shortnacy, Michael) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/4/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B. Shortnacy on behalf of Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, USA, Inc. (Shortnacy, Michael)Attorney Michael B. Shortnacy added to party Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael B. Shortnacy added to party Toyota Motor North America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael B. Shortnacy added to party Toyota Motor Sales, USA, Inc.(pty:dft) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/4/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmr)(jms). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/4/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13653540.), filed by Tina Feng. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-534-CAB-BLM. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Nelson, John)(jmr) (jms). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/4/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feng v. Toyota Motor North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: John Peter Hooper
Represented By: Michael B Shortnacy
Represented By: John Hooper
Represented By: Eric F. Gladbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America Inc.
Represented By: John Peter Hooper
Represented By: Michael B Shortnacy
Represented By: John Hooper
Represented By: Eric F. Gladbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.
Represented By: John Peter Hooper
Represented By: Michael B Shortnacy
Represented By: John Hooper
Represented By: Eric F. Gladbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Feng
Represented By: John J. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?