YSF Holdings, LLC v. Western World Insurance Company
Plaintiff: YSF Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Western World Insurance Company Inc. and Western World Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv02707
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Referring Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by YSF Holdings, LLC. Western World Insurance Company Inc. served on 7/13/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Service of the Complaint) (Skjountzos, Magdalene)
July 29, 2020 Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information re: #6 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Magdalene P. Skjountzos, Esq. --- Because it appears that plaintiff's counsel attempted to file proof of effective service of the summons and complaint on the defendant, plaintiff's counsel should have used the SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED event and not the SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED event indicating that service was not effectuated. You MUST use the appropriate SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED event found under Service of Process to refile your document. When submitting electronic filings with the court Counsel must use the appropriate event at all times. If you are unsure of the appropriate event you can contact the Clerk's Office for assistance. CM/ECF training is available at the courthouse free of charge. For more information regarding training, counsel can contact Evelyn Levine, Training Specialist, at (718) 613-2312. (Almonte, Kelly)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by YSF Holdings, LLC as to YSF Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Service of the Complaint) (Skjountzos, Magdalene)
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Western World Insurance Company Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 19, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Complaint, by YSF Holdings, LLC (Skjountzos, Magdalene) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla).
June 18, 2020 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANa/k/a WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY Y INC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12945510 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by YSF HOLDINGS, LLC T/A KAMWAY LODGE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint in State Court Action, #2 Exhibit YSF Answer, #3 Exhibit Policy, #4 Exhibit Disclaimer) (Skjountzos, Magdalene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YSF Holdings, LLC v. Western World Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western World Insurance Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western World Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YSF Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Magdalene P. Skjountzos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?