Lematta v. Casper Sleep, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT LEMATTA
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, JACK LAZAR, ANTHONY FLORENCE, NEIL PARIKH, DIANE IRVINE, GUGGENHEIM SECURITIES, LLC, PHILIP KRIM, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., PIPER SANDLER & CO., BENJAMIN LERER, UBS Securities LLC, DANI REISS, KAREN KATZ, GREGORY MACFARLANE, JEFFERIES LLC, BofA Securities, Inc., CASPER SLEEP INC., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC and Casper Sleep, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02744
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order STATUS REPORT ORDER Status Report due by 9/11/2020.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 8/3/2020. (Levy, Robert)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 8/3/2020. (Levy, Robert)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Casper Sleep, Inc., Anthony Florence, Diane Irvine, Karen Katz, Philip Krim, Jack Lazar, Benjamin Lerer, Gregory Macfarlane, Neil Parikh, Dani Reiss. (Soloway, Audra)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Casper Sleep, Inc. (Soloway, Audra)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BofA Securities, Inc., Casper Sleep, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Anthony Florence, GUGGENHEIM SECURITIES, LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Diane Irvine, Jefferies LLC, Karen Katz, Philip Krim, Jack Lazar, Benjamin Lerer, Gregory Macfarlane, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, PIPER SANDLER & CO., Neil Parikh. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summon, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons) (Davis, Kimberly)
June 22, 2020 NOTICE re #3 Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening : Due to the amount of errors made when filing this case, Plaintiff counsel is advised to refer to the Attorney Case Opening Video Tutorial/Manual before filing another case electronically. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 22, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 22, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12953037 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by ROBERT LEMATTA. (Attachments: #1 PSLRA Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons to Casper, #4 Proposed Summons to Krim, #5 Proposed Summons to MacFarlane, #6 Proposed Summons to Parikh, #7 Proposed Summons to Irvine, #8 Proposed Summons to Florence, #9 Proposed Summons to Lazar, #10 Proposed Summons to Lerer, #11 Proposed Summons to Katz, #12 Proposed Summons to Reiss, #13 Proposed Summons to Morgan Stanley, #14 Proposed Summons to Goldman Sachs, #15 Proposed Summons to Jeffries, #16 Proposed Summons to BofA, #17 Proposed Summons to UBS, #18 Proposed Summons to Citigroup, #19 Proposed Summons to Piper Sandler, #20 Proposed Summons to Guggenheim) (Kim, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lematta v. Casper Sleep, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT LEMATTA
Represented By: Phillip Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACK LAZAR
Represented By: Audra J. Soloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY FLORENCE
Represented By: Audra J. Soloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEIL PARIKH
Represented By: Audra J. Soloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANE IRVINE
Represented By: Audra J. Soloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUGGENHEIM SECURITIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIP KRIM
Represented By: Audra J. Soloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PIPER SANDLER & CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENJAMIN LERER
Represented By: Audra J. Soloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANI REISS
Represented By: Audra J. Soloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAREN KATZ
Represented By: Audra J. Soloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY MACFARLANE
Represented By: Audra J. Soloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BofA Securities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CASPER SLEEP INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casper Sleep, Inc.
Represented By: Audra J. Soloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?