Inesti v. People of the State of NY
Petitioner: Mark Inesti
Respondent: People of the State of N.Y.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02812
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: William F Kuntz
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the instant petition is dismissed for the same reasons discussed in Petitioner's prior action; and that no certificate of appealability shall issue, See 28 U.S.C. 2253(c)(2). Ordered by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court on 8/3/2020. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Mark Inesti ("Petitioner"), currently incarcerated at Clinton Correctional Facility, brings this pro se petition for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 challenging the constitutionality of his 1996 conviction in the New York Supreme Court, Kings County. Pet. at 1. Petitioner paid the required filing fee. The instant petition is a duplicate of a section 2254 action Petitioner previously filed in this court, which was dismissed on July 20, 2020. Inesti v. People of the State of N.Y., 20-CV-1753, ECF No. 9 (E.D.N.Y.) (Kuntz, J.). Accordingly, the instant petition is dismissed for the same reasons discussed in Petitioner's prior action. The clerk of court is respectfully directed to close this case. A certificate of appealability shall not issue. See 28 U.S.C. 2253(c)(2). So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 7/31/2020. (Love, Alexis)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 FILING FEE: $ 5.00, receipt number 4653150890 for Mark Inesti. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mark Inesti. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT FILING, litigant notified of deficiency(s) that must be corrected within fourteen (14) days. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of New York Western; Case Number 6:20-cv-06301. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 15, 2020 Clerk mailed copy of #2 Order to pro se petitioner. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/24/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing that this matter be transferred to the Eastern District of NY.. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 5/14/20. CLERK OF THE COURT IS DIRECTED TO MAIL A COPY OF THIS NEF AND ORDER TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF AT FIVE POINTS.(KAP)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- [Transferred from New York Western on 6/24/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. Prisoner Pro Se packet consisting of Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, and Civil Case Timeline mailed to plaintiff. (TF) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/24/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Mark Inesti.(TF) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/24/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inesti v. People of the State of NY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Inesti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: People of the State of N.Y.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?