Van Guilder v. Tynon
Case Number: 1:2020cv02839
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 CASE: 1:20-cv-02839 DETAILS: Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in Northern District of New York - Main Office (Syracuse) [NextGen CM/ECF Release 1.3 (Revision 1.3.6)] as case 9:20-cv-00741, filed 07/02/2020. (Marziliano, August)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER, Accordingly, the Court directs the Clerk to transfer this petition to the Northern District of New York. The Court waives the provision of Local Rule 83.1 which requires a seven-day stay. No summons shall issue from this Court. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case and mail a copy of this Order to the Petitioner at the address of record. Case transferred to the Northern District of New York Via ECF ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 7/2/2020. (Piper, Francine)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 Letter dated June 23, 2020 from Christopher VanGuilder to Court Clerk, enclosing transcripts related to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Piper, Francine)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 FILING FEE: $ 5.00, receipt number 4653150652 (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus , filed by Christopher Van Guilder. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit of Service) (Bowens, Priscilla) Modified on 6/29/2020 (Bowens, Priscilla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Guilder v. Tynon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?