NY Drilling, Inc. v. TJM, Inc. LLC
Plaintiff: NY Drilling, Inc.
Defendant: TJM, Inc. LLC, TJM Drilling Equipment & Supply Company, TJM Inc. Drilling Equipment & Supply Company and TJM Drill Tools
Case Number: 1:2020cv03111
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Eric R Komitee
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eric R. Komitee: Telephone Pre Motion Conference held on 9/2/2020. Plaintiff shall amend its complaint by September 23, 2020. Defendant shall answer, or move to dismiss the amended complaint by October 21, 2020. If Defendant moves to dismiss the amended complaint, Plaintiff shall serve a response by November 18, 2020; and Defendant shall serve a reply, if any, by November 30, 2020. (Electronically Recorded.) (Guy, Alicia)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to an unanticipated change in the Court's calendar, the pre-motion conference set for September 3, 2020, is advanced to September 2, 2020, at 2:30 p.m. The parties are directed to call 888-808-6929 five minutes before the scheduled start of the conference and use access code 564-7824. Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 8/31/2020. (Guy, Alicia)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion for Jordan M. Webster Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150.00 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 8/28/2020. (Vertus, Miriam)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jordan M. Webster Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13280641. by TJM, Inc. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Webster, Jordan)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pre Motion Conference -- A Pre Motion Hearing will be held on September 3, 2020, at 10:15 a.m. by telephone. The parties are directed to call 888-808-6929 five minutes before the scheduled start of the conference and use access code 564-7824. Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 8/18/2020. (Guy, Alicia)
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re #1 Complaint, filed by NY Drilling, Inc.. (Giusti, Robert)
August 6, 2020 NOTICE: Defendant submitted a letter requesting a pre-motion conference on an anticipated motion to dismiss on August 5, 2020. Plaintiff's counsel is reminded that pursuant to Rule III.A.3 of this Court's Individual Motion Practices and Rules, plaintiff is required to serve and file a letter response of three pages or less, within five days from service of defendant's letter. (Guy, Alicia)
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline M. Weyand on behalf of TJM, Inc. LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Weyand, Jacqueline)
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TJM, Inc. LLC identifying Corporate Parent none for TJM, Inc. LLC. (Weyand, Jacqueline)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re #1 Complaint, by TJM, Inc. LLC. (Weyand, Jacqueline)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NY Drilling, Inc.. TJM, Inc. LLC served on 7/15/2020, answer due 8/5/2020. (Giusti, Robert)
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta)
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to TJM, Inc. LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 13, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by NY Drilling, Inc. (Giusti, Robert)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13056238 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by NY Drilling, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Giusti, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NY Drilling, Inc. v. TJM, Inc. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TJM, Inc. LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline M. Weyand
Represented By: Jordan Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TJM Drilling Equipment & Supply Company
Represented By: Jacqueline M. Weyand
Represented By: Jordan Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TJM Inc. Drilling Equipment & Supply Company
Represented By: Jacqueline M. Weyand
Represented By: Jordan Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TJM Drill Tools
Represented By: Jacqueline M. Weyand
Represented By: Jordan Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NY Drilling, Inc.
Represented By: Robert F. Giusti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?