Shamsiev et al v. EL AL Israel Airlines Ltd.
Plaintiff: Bela Shamsiev
Defendant: EL AL Israel Airlines Ltd. and Jane Doe
Case Number: 1:2020cv03208
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Rachel P Kovner
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER The parties' stipulation of discontinuance is due by September 21, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/24/2020. (LK)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Bela Shamsiev (Sonkin, Steven)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER #7 Application granted, on consent. The August 13th initial conference is adjourned sine die. By August 24, 2020, the parties shall file a joint status report and, if no settlement agreement in principle has been reached, a joint letter-motion requesting the rescheduling of the proceeding. In the future, the Court will not consider a request for judicial action that has not been docketed as an ECF motion event. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/7/2020. (LK)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 Letter Letter requesting adjournment of initial conference by Bela Shamsiev (Sonkin, Steven)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic initial conference will be held on August 13, 2020 @ 12:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED: ORDER, INITIAL CONFERENCE QUESTIONNAIRE, AND MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE.Counsel are directed to confer to jointly fill out and docket the attached questionnaire by close of business August 12, 2020. As the date approaches, chambers staff will provide counsel with the logistical information necessary to participate in the proceeding. (LK)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Lee Sonkin on behalf of Bela Shamsiev (aty to be noticed) (Sonkin, Steven)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) / Answer of Defendant EL AL Israel Airlines Ltd. to Plaintiff's Complaint by EL AL Israel Airlines Ltd.. (Wilson, Diane)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniella Levi on behalf of Bela Shamsiev (notification declined or already on case) (Levi, Daniella)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 20, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by EL AL Israel Airlines Ltd. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Queens, case number 708011/2020. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13082249) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint in Queens Supreme Court, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's boarding pass, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Tingey, Rebecca)
July 17, 2020 NOTICE : Please file the Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Proposed Summon and pay the Civil Filing for the following case so that it may be processed. (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shamsiev et al v. EL AL Israel Airlines Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EL AL Israel Airlines Ltd.
Represented By: Rebecca A. Tingey
Represented By: Diane Westwood Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bela Shamsiev
Represented By: Diane Westwood Wilson
Represented By: Daniella Levi
Represented By: Steven Lee Sonkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?