Zammito v. The United States of America
Plaintiff: Phyllis Zammito
Defendant: The United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv03209
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phyllis Zammito. The United States of America served on 8/14/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Manes, Barbara)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 22, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 22, 2020 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against The United States of America filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13092910 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Phyllis Zammito. (Manes, Barbara) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla).
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Phyllis Zammito (Manes, Barbara) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/22/2020) (Bowens, Priscilla).
July 17, 2020 Notice: Re: Incomplete Documents. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without completed Main Document (Complaint or Notice of Removal). (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Phyllis Zammito (Manes, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zammito v. The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Zammito
Represented By: Barbara Ellen Manes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?