Acheampong v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Isaac Kwasi Acheampong
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv03293
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Pamela K Chen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Zeigler on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (aty to be noticed) (Zeigler, Anne)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Courtesy copies of the Summons, the Court's 7/23/2020 Order and Plaintiff's Complaint sent to the United States Attorney General; United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York; and General Counsel at SSA.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff, pro se, is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Defendant shall file the administrative record, which will constitute Defendant's answer, or otherwise move against the complaint by October 21, 2020. Defendant shall file and serve a motion for judgment on the pleadings, which must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and administrative record, by December 21, 2020. Plaintiff shall file and serve a response to Defendant's motion, and any cross-motion, by February 21, 2021. Defendant shall file and serve its reply, if any, by March 15, 2021. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 7/23/2020. (Abdallah, Fida)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Isaac Kwasi Acheampong. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Isaac Kwasi Acheampong. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acheampong v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Represented By: Anne Zeigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Kwasi Acheampong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?