Blake v. General Motors LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael F. Blake
Defendant: General Motors LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Moore Buick GMC Truck, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Rough Country LLC, Van Buren GMC Sales Corp. and Van Buren Truck Sales, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03337
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Steven M Gold
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Third Party Complaint as to Rough Country LLC, Van Buren GMC Sales Corp., Van Buren Truck Sales, Inc.. (Piper, Francine)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. Re #8 Third Party Complaint by Moore Buick GMC Truck, Inc. (Rech, Patricia)
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Moore Buick GMC Truck, Inc.. (Rech, Patricia)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Per email correspondence with counsel Patricia K. Rech and my Case Manager Saudia Gillespie; three separate Third Party Complaints were filed incorrectly on the docket sheet causing numerous errors. The Clerk's Office and my Chambers have corrected these errors by deleting the previous entries and re-filing the document (see Dkt. #8 ). In the future, counsel is reminded to contact the ECF Help Desk at (718) 613-2571 or Saudia Gillespie at 718-613-2560 for assistance with filing electronically. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 8/5/2020. (Gillespie, Saudia)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. Rech on behalf of Moore Buick GMC Truck, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Rech, Patricia)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Van Buren GMC Sales Corp., Van Buren Truck Sales, Inc., Rough Country LLC, filed by Moore Buick GMC Truck, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Gillespie, Saudia)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared Scotto on behalf of Michael F. Blake (aty to be noticed) (Scotto, Jared)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Albert R. Matuza, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Matuza, Albert)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with, CROSSCLAIM against Moore Buick GMC Truck, Inc. by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Kramer, Steven)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 24, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by General Motors LLC from Supreme Queens, case number 707678/2020. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13111890) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex A: Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex B: Co-D Moore Buick Answer, #4 Exhibit Ex C: Co-D Email Consent to Removal, #5 Exhibit Ex D: Notice of Removal, #6 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service) (Kramer, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blake v. General Motors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Moore Buick GMC Truck, Inc.
Represented By: Patricia K. Rech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael F. Blake
Represented By: Evan R. Levtow
Represented By: Jared Scotto
Represented By: Albert R. Matuza, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Steven R. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Rough Country LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Van Buren GMC Sales Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Van Buren Truck Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?