Gilmore v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Bruce Gilmore
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv03410
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER re #2 Summons Issued as to USA. Counsel is advised that on March 2, 2020, the Commissioner of Social Security filed a notice in the Federal Register setting forth the names and current addresses for service of process on the Commissioner in disability cases for each United States District Court. See https://www.federalregister.gov/documents/2020/03/02/2020-04246/notice-announcing-addresses-for-service-of-process. The Notice announced that service of process for the Eastern District of New York was directed to be made upon the Regional Chief Counsel's Office in Kansas City, Missouri.The Department of Justice and U.S. Attorneys Office shall be served in the manner prescribed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 8/12/2020. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Zeigler on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (aty to be noticed) (Zeigler, Anne)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER. Defendant shall obtain and serve upon plaintiff the administrative record, which shall constitute defendant's answer, or otherwise move against the complaint, by October 28, 2020. If defendant is unable to file the record by that date, then defendant shall notify the court in writing at least two days before the deadline, specifying a date for an extension and demonstrating good cause therefor, and the efforts made to obtain the record. Plaintiff shall move for judgment on the pleadings, by service of motion papers upon defendant, and defendant may serve its optional cross-motion for judgment on the pleadings upon plaintiff, by December 28, 2020; each party's response papers are to be served upon the opposing party by January 27, 2021; and the parties may serve their optional reply on the opposing party, and defendant shall file the entire set of motion papers, stipulations of fact, and the administrative record with the court, on or before February 11, 2021. Pursuant to chambers practice concerning stipulations of fact for social security motions, the parties shall confer and prepare a stipulation of facts with a chronology of medical treatment, to be filed on ECF on the date that the fully-briefed motions are due. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 7/30/2020. (Zhang, Grace)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13131765 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Bruce Gilmore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Skovronsky, Harold)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilmore v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Represented By: Anne Zeigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Gilmore
Represented By: Harold Skovronsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?