Polish Army Veterans of America, Inc. et al v. Stasiewicz
Plaintiff: Dom, Inc. a/k/a The Polish National Home, Polish Army Veterans of America District No. 2, Inc., Teofil Lachowiz and Polish Army Veterans of America, Inc.
Defendant: Marek Stasiewicz
Case Number: 1:2020cv03419
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Court grants plaintiff's request for an extension of time to file its opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss. Plaintiff shall file its oppositon on or before November 11, 2020; and defendant shall file his reply on or before November 25, 2020. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 9/23/2020. (Williams, Tenisha)
September 23, 2020 Filing 11 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction from 10-12-20 to 11-11-20 by Dom, Inc. a/k/a The Polish National Home, Teofil Lachowiz, Polish Army Veterans of America District No. 2, Inc., Polish Army Veterans of America, Inc.. (Giunta, Lisa)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER re #9 . In view of defendant's pro se status, the Court liberally construes defendant's submission as a motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction and directs plaintiffs to respond to the motion and to file their response on or before October 12, 2020. Defendant shall file a reply, if any, on or before October 26, 2020. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 9/10/2020. (Williams, Tenisha)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Letter to Hon. Margo K. Brodie dated September 4, 2020 by overnight mail served on Marek Stasiewicz on September 4, 2020, filed by Dom, Inc. a/k/a The Polish National Home, Teofil Lachowiz, Polish Army Veterans of America District No. 2, Inc., Polish Army Veterans of America, Inc.. (Giunta, Lisa)
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for the Court to set a briefing schedule, to reject the motion as procedurally defective and to provide additional clarification and guidance by Dom, Inc. a/k/a The Polish National Home, Teofil Lachowiz, Polish Army Veterans of America District No. 2, Inc., Polish Army Veterans of America, Inc.. (Giunta, Lisa)
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Marek Stasiewicz. (Piper, Francine)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Polish Army Veterans of America, Inc., Teofil Lachowiz, Dom, Inc. a/k/a The Polish National Home, Polish Army Veterans of America District No. 2, Inc.. (Peirez, David)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Polish Army Veterans of America, Inc., Teofil Lachowiz, Dom, Inc. a/k/a The Polish National Home, Polish Army Veterans of America District No. 2, Inc.. Marek Stasiewicz served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. (Peirez, David)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Ann Giunta on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Giunta, Lisa)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 29, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13132910 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Polish Army Veterans of America, Inc., Teofil Lachowiz, Dom, Inc. a/k/a The Polish National Home, Polish Army Veterans of America District No. 2, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - First Letter, #3 Exhibit B - Second Letter, #4 Exhibit C - Third Letter, #5 Exhibit D - January 18, 2019 email, #6 Exhibit E - Fourth Letter, #7 Exhibit F - List of 74 email recipients of the Letters, #8 Exhibit G - Cease and Desist Letter, #9 Exhibit H - Response, #10 Proposed Summons) (Peirez, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polish Army Veterans of America, Inc. et al v. Stasiewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dom, Inc. a/k/a The Polish National Home
Represented By: David H. Peirez
Represented By: Lisa Ann Giunta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Polish Army Veterans of America District No. 2, Inc.
Represented By: David H. Peirez
Represented By: Lisa Ann Giunta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teofil Lachowiz
Represented By: David H. Peirez
Represented By: Lisa Ann Giunta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Polish Army Veterans of America, Inc.
Represented By: David H. Peirez
Represented By: Lisa Ann Giunta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marek Stasiewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?