Kazanskaya v. JetBlue Airways Corporation
Plaintiff: Svetlana Kazanskaya
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv03459
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for all Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures: August 21, 2020. First request for production of documents and first request for interrogatories due by: September 11, 2020. Deadline for joinder of additional parties and amendment of pleadings: October 16, 2020. Status Conference (with joint status report due two business days in advance): December 9, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. Fact discovery to be completed by: January 22, 2021. Plaintiff's expert disclosures due by: February 19, 2021. Defendant's expert disclosures due by: March 26, 2021. All discovery, including all expert disclosures under Rule 26(a)(2), if any, to be completed by: March 26, 2021. Pretrial Conference (ex parte statements of settlement position due via email two business days in advance): April 7, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. Dispositive motion process started by: April 21, 2021. Joint pretrial order due by: May 25, 2021. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 8/26/2020. (Orenstein, James)
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein: Initial Conference Hearing held by telephone on 8/26/2020. Scheduling: (1) The next status conference will be held on December 9, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. (2) A pretrial conference will be held on April 7, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. Summary: The plaintiff has no procedural objection to the removal of the case to this court. I will enter a separate case management and scheduling order that reflects, with minor modifications, the deadlines set forth in the parties' joint discovery plan. (Orenstein, James)
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 Letter to Magistrate Orenstein Attaching Initial Conference Questionnaire by JetBlue Airways Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Initial Conference Questionnaire) (Maragoudakis, Michael)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(a), I order the parties to attend an initial discovery planning conference on August 26, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. that will take place telephonically. The call-in information for the telephone conference is 1-877-336-1839 and the access code is 391-4302. I respectfully direct all counsel to call in to the telephone conference five minutes before the conference begins. If any party has any difficulty accessing the telephone conference, please contact chambers at Orenstein_Chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov. No later than August 24, 2020, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF (Electronic Case Filing) system, a joint proposed discovery plan. Each party's counsel must be personally prepared to discuss all factual and legal issues in the case, including the possibility of settlement; otherwise, the client must attend in person as well. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 8/4/2020. (Almonte, Kelly)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Forzano on behalf of Svetlana Kazanskaya (notification declined or already on case) (Forzano, Anthony)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis Robert Martinez on behalf of JetBlue Airways Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Martinez, Louis)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Initiating Documents served on Plaintiff on 07/31/2020, filed by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Maragoudakis, Michael)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Maragoudakis, Michael)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JetBlue Airways Corporation (Maragoudakis, Michael)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 31, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JetBlue Airways Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13144525) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B- Summons and Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Maragoudakis, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kazanskaya v. JetBlue Airways Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Represented By: Michael G. Maragoudakis
Represented By: Louis Robert Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Svetlana Kazanskaya
Represented By: Anthony J. Forzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?