Wingate v. State of New York
Petitioner: Blake Wingate
Respondent: State Of New York
Case Number: 1:2020cv03547
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Electronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals. #8 Notice of Appeal, Documents are available via Pacer. For docket entries without a hyperlink or for documents under seal, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (McGee, Mary Ann)
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #7 Clerk's Judgment,, #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Blake Wingate. No fee paid. In Forma Pauperis denied for purposes of appeal. A Certificate for Appealability is also denied. Service done electronically. Please note that although timely, Appellant includes a request for an extension of time to file appeal. (Attachments: #1 Request for an Extension of Time, #2 Verification) (McGee, Mary Ann)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT that the petition for a writ of habeas corpus is denied without prejudice; that no certificate of appealability shall issue, See 28 U.S.C. 2253(c)(2); Lucidore v. N.Y. State Div. of Parole, 209 F.3d 107, 112-13 (2d Cir. 2000); that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a), any appeal would not be taken in good faith; and that in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal, See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Signed by Clerk of Court, Douglas C. Palmer, and by Deputy Clerk, Jalitza Poveda, on 8/24/2020. (Copy of judgment and Appeals Packet mailed to Pro Se). (Herrera, Isaiah)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. The petition for a writ of habeas corpus is dismissed without prejudice. A certificate of appealability will not be issued because the petitioner has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right. See 28 U.S.C. 2253(c)(2); Lucidore v. N.Y. State Div. of Parole, 209 F.3d 107, 112-13 (2d Cir. 2000). The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) that any appeal would not be taken in good faith, and in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case Ordered by Judge Ann M Donnelly on 8/21/2020. (Greene, Donna)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from Blake Wingate to Clerk of Court dated 8/13/2020 requesting full copy of the AEDPA Habeas. (Herrera, Isaiah)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of New York Northern; Case Number 9:20-cv-00873. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that this action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 8/5/2020. {order served via regular mail on petitioner}(nas, ) [Transferred from New York Northern on 8/6/2020.]
August 4, 2020 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis SEE ENTRY #2 by Blake Wingate. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Blake Wingate.(nas, ) [Transferred from New York Northern on 8/6/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Blake Wingate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 envelope)(nas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 8/6/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wingate v. State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Blake Wingate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State Of New York
Represented By: QUEENS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE - GENERIC
Represented By: NEW YORK STATE ATTORNEY GENERALS OFFICE - GENERIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?