Yusufov et al v. Thomas A. Moorehead, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Zakhar Yusufov, Bela Yevseyeva and Sosun Yusufov
Defendant: Thomas A. Moorehead, Inc doing business as BMW of Sterling and BMW of North America LLC doing business as BMW Group Financial Services
Case Number: 1:2020cv03583
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig James Franco on behalf of Thomas A. Moorehead, Inc (notification declined or already on case) (Franco, Craig)
October 2, 2020 Filing 16 DECLARATION re #15 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,, Receipt for $150 Pro Hac Vice Admission Fee for Craig Franco, Esq. by Thomas A. Moorehead, Inc (Shehan, Kevin)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Craig Franco is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant Thomas A. Moorehead, Inc. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/1/2020. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
October 1, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13452616. by Thomas A. Moorehead, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service) (Franco, Craig)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant Morehead's letter application #8 dated 9/9/20 and defendant BMW's letter application #10 dated 9/11/20 are GRANTED. A pre motion conference is scheduled for November 24, 2020 @ 3:00PM. There will be no formal notice mailed to counsel. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other the date and time of this conference. If this date presents a conflict counsel shall first obtain the consent from all the parties to adjourn this conference and then file a letter application. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 9/17/2020. (Innelli, Michael)
September 15, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Augustine Andreacchi on behalf of BMW of North America LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Andreacchi, Steven)
September 15, 2020 Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY (Cubano, Jazmin)
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BMW of North America LLC identifying Corporate Parent BMW (US) Holding Corp. for BMW of North America LLC. (Andreacchi, Steven)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 Letter addressed to Hon. Frederic Block requesting a Pre-Motion Conference by BMW of North America LLC (Andreacchi, Steven)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thomas A. Moorehead, Inc (Shehan, Kevin)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re #1 Complaint, by Thomas A. Moorehead, Inc. (Shehan, Kevin)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sosun Yusufov, Bela Yevseyeva, Zakhar Yusufov. BMW of North America LLC served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Feinerman, David)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sosun Yusufov, Bela Yevseyeva, Zakhar Yusufov. Thomas A. Moorehead, Inc served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. (Feinerman, David)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. This case has been designated to participate in the Court Annexed Arbitration Program pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.7(d). The Rule requires the Clerk of Court to designate and process for compulsory arbitration "all civil cases (excluding social security cases, tax matters, prisoners' civil rights cases, and any action based on an alleged violation of a right secured by the Constitution of the United States or if jurisdiction is based in whole or in part on Title 28 U.S.C. sec. 1343) wherein money damages only are being sought in an amount not in excess of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs." Damages are presumed not to be in excess of the arbitration limit unless a certification is filed in accordance with Local Civil Rule 83.7(d) (3). An Arbitration Hearing will be scheduled after an Answer is filed. The hearing will occur approximately 120 days after filing of the Answer. (Credle, Rita)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13185442 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Sosun Yusufov, Bela Yevseyeva, Zakhar Yusufov. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Feinerman, David)
August 10, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yusufov et al v. Thomas A. Moorehead, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zakhar Yusufov
Represented By: David A. Feinerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bela Yevseyeva
Represented By: David A. Feinerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sosun Yusufov
Represented By: David A. Feinerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A. Moorehead, Inc doing business as BMW of Sterling
Represented By: Craig James Franco
Represented By: Kevin James Shehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America LLC doing business as BMW Group Financial Services
Represented By: Steven Augustine Andreacchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?