Ou v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Guangwei Ou
Defendant: Mark Hazuda, Ken Cuccinelli, US Atty General William Barr and Chad Wolf
Case Number: 1:2020cv03588
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Carol Bagley Amon
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary M. Dickman on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Dickman, Mary)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Guangwei Ou. William Barr served on 8/11/2020, answer due 10/12/2020; Ken Cuccinelli served on 8/11/2020, answer due 10/12/2020; Mark Hazuda served on 8/11/2020, answer due 10/12/2020; Chad Wolf served on 8/11/2020, answer due 10/12/2020. (Zheng, Taobo)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Mark Hazuda, Chad Wolf, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Davis, Kimberly)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT GUANGWEI OU against William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Mark Hazuda, Chad Wolf filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13193493 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Guangwei Ou. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Zheng, Taobo)
August 11, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 11, 2020 NOTICE :Please file the Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Proposed Summon and pay the Civil Filing for the following case so that we may process this case. (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ou v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hazuda
Represented By: Mary M. Dickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cuccinelli
Represented By: Mary M. Dickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Atty General William Barr
Represented By: Mary M. Dickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Mary M. Dickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guangwei Ou
Represented By: Taobo Zheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?