Hadmira v. Hess Retail Stores, etal
Plaintiff: C. Leacock Hadmira
Defendant: Hess Retail Stores, etal, Speedway Gas Station, Speedway, LLC and Hess Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv03619
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Referring Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by C. Leacock Hadmira (Roth, Adam)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for all Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures: September 2, 2020. First request for production of documents and first request for interrogatories due by: September 2, 2020. Deadline for joinder of additional parties and amendment of pleadings: October 2, 2020. Fact discovery to be completed by: November 2, 2020. Plaintiff's expert disclosures due by: December 2, 2020. Defendants' expert disclosures due by: January 4, 2021. All discovery, including all expert disclosures under Rule 26(a)(2), if any, to be completed by: January 4, 2021. Pretrial Conference (ex parte statements of settlement position due via email two business days in advance): January 20, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/2/2020. (Orenstein, James)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #7 First MOTION to Remand to State Court because Removal was untimely filed by C. Leacock Hadmira. For the reasons set forth on the record during the conference on September 2, 2020, I respectfully recommend that the court deny the motion. Objections to R&R due by 9/16/2020. See docket entry #11 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/2/2020. (Orenstein, James)
September 2, 2020 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein: Initial Conference Hearing held by telephone on 9/2/2020. Scheduling: The next pretrial conference will be held on January 20, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. Summary: As set forth on the record, I heard argument on the plaintiff's motion to remand and made an oral report and recommendation respectfully urging the court to deny the motion. Any party may file an objection (which should include the transcript of today's proceeding) by September 16, 2020. I will enter a separate case management and scheduling order that contemplates the completion of all remaining discovery (the parties having already exchanged some discovery over the past two years during state court proceedings) within four months. (Orenstein, James)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT on behalf of all parties (Roth, Adam)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING MOTION: Plaintiff's motion to remand to state court #7 is respectfully referred to Magistrate Judge James Orenstein for a report and recommendation. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 8/17/2020. (Williams, Erica)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY in Support re #7 First MOTION to Remand to State Court because Removal was untimely, #8 Letter,, filed by C. Leacock Hadmira. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Benn v. Metro North) (Roth, Adam)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 Letter in Opposition to Plaintiff's Letter Motion by Hess Corporation, Hess Retail Stores, etal, Speedway Gas Station, Speedway, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answer and Demands, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff Response to Demands, #3 Exhibit Letter to Plaintiff, #4 Exhibit Preliminary Conference Order, #5 Exhibit Letter to Plaintiff, #6 Exhibit Letter from Plaintiff, #7 Exhibit Letter to Plaintiff, #8 Exhibit Plaintiff's Response to Compliance Conference Order, #9 Exhibit Motion to Compel, #10 Exhibit Plaintiff's Suppl Response to Combined Demands to, #11 Exhibit Order, #12 Exhibit Plaintiff's Deposition) (Manna, Melissa)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION to Remand to State Court because Removal was untimely by C. Leacock Hadmira. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2nd Supplemental Bill of Particulars) (Roth, Adam)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J Roth on behalf of C. Leacock Hadmira (aty to be noticed) (Roth, Adam)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(a), I order the parties to attend an initial discovery planning conference on September 2, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. that will take place telephonically. The call-in information for the telephone conference is 1-877-336-1839 and the access code is 391-4302. I respectfully direct all counsel to call in to the telephone conference five minutes before the conference begins. If any party has any difficulty accessing the telephone conference, please contact chambers at Orenstein_Chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov. No later than August 31, 2020, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF (Electronic Case Filing) system, a joint proposed discovery plan. Each party's counsel must be personally prepared to discuss all factual and legal issues in the case, including the possibility of settlement; otherwise, the client must attend in person as well. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 8/12/2020. (Almonte, Kelly)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 11, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Hess Retail Stores, etal. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hess Retail Stores, etal from Supreme Kings, case number 522043/2018. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13194965) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Rule 7.1 Statement, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit Defendant Speedway Answer, #5 Exhibit Plaintiff Bill of Particulars, #6 Exhibit Certificate of Merger, #7 Exhibit Plaintiff's Response to Combined Demands, #8 Exhibit Correspondence to Plaintiff, #9 Exhibit Preliminary Conference Order, #10 Exhibit Correspondence to Plaintiff, #11 Exhibit Correspondence from Plaintiff, #12 Exhibit Demand for Ad Damnum, #13 Exhibit Compliance Conference Order, #14 Exhibit Plaintiff Response to Compliance Conference Order, #15 Exhibit Motion to Compel without exhibits, #16 Exhibit Plaintiff's Response to Ad Damnum) (Manna, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hadmira v. Hess Retail Stores, etal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. Leacock Hadmira
Represented By: Adam J Roth
Represented By: Robert J. Eisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Retail Stores, etal
Represented By: Melissa Manna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway Gas Station
Represented By: Melissa Manna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway, LLC
Represented By: Melissa Manna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Manna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?