Eliyahu et al v. EL AL Israel Airlines
Plaintiff: Y. E. and Karina Eliyahu
Defendant: EL AL Israel Airlines
Case Number: 1:2020cv03692
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Carol Bagley Amon
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: As discussed during the 9/22/2020 conference, all discovery must be completed by 4/30/2021. On or before 4/30/2021, the Parties will file a joint status report letter confirming that discovery is complete. On or before 5/21/2021, the Parties will initiate any dispositive motions in accordance with the Individual Rules of the District Judge. On or before 6/21/2021, the Parties will file their joint Proposed Pretrial Order. A Telephone Conference is set for 1/14/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. On or before 1/7/2021, the Parties will file a joint status report letter, of no more than three pages, identifying any outstanding discovery disputes. The Parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Please do not use the speaker function on your phone, remember to identify yourselves every time you speak, and speak slowly and deliberately for purposes of the record. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 9/22/2020. (Quinlan, Krista)
September 22, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Telephone Conference held on 9/22/2020. Steven C. November appearing for Plaintiffs. Rebecca A. Tingey appearing for Defendant. See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding. (FTR Log #3:24-3:40.) (Quinlan, Krista)
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 Proposed Scheduling Order by EL AL Israel Airlines (Wilson, Diane)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Y. E. (Levine, Andrew)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca A. Tingey on behalf of EL AL Israel Airlines (aty to be noticed) (Tingey, Rebecca)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, a Telephonic Initial Conference is scheduled for 9/22/2020 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to confirm with Defendant's counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 9/17/2020. The Parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283. Should the Parties experience delays or difficulty accessing the conference bridge due to a high volume of calls, please dial again. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 8/31/2020. (Quinlan, Krista)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by EL AL Israel Airlines. (Wilson, Diane)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 21, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by EL AL Israel Airlines. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by EL AL Israel Airlines from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Kings, case number 511604/2020. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13249135) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - State Court Docket, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) (Wilson, Diane)
August 17, 2020 NOTICE : Please file the Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Proposed Summon and pay the Civil Filing for the following case so that it may be processed. (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eliyahu et al v. EL AL Israel Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y. E.
Represented By: Steven C. November
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karina Eliyahu
Represented By: Steven C. November
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EL AL Israel Airlines
Represented By: Rebecca A. Tingey
Represented By: Diane Westwood Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?