Atas v. Shtern et al
Plaintiff: Hicri Atas
Defendant: Garry Shtern and Toyota Lease Trust
Case Number: 1:2020cv03733
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Steven M Gold
Referring Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Hoffman on behalf of Hicri Atas (aty to be noticed) (Hoffman, Steven)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic-initial conference will be held on October 29, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. before the undersigned. Counsel for all parties must participate. Counsel shall confer with each other, complete the attached initial conference questionnaire and electronically file two days prior to the conference. Each party is directed to call the following conference number: 877-336-1839 and use access code 3482793. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 9/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Individual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Dismissing Parties: Party Toyota Lease Trust terminated.Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 9/10/2020. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Toyota Lease Trust only by Toyota Lease Trust (Aaron, Clifford)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Toyota Lease Trust of Notice of Removal (Aaron, Clifford)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Garry Shtern Demand for a trial by jury (Camacho, Andres)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Andres Javier Camacho on behalf of Garry Shtern (aty to be noticed) (Camacho, Andres)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Hicri Atas (Kim, Albert)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Albert K Kim on behalf of Hicri Atas (aty to be noticed) (Kim, Albert)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Toyota Lease Trust identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Motor Corporation for Toyota Lease Trust. (Aaron, Clifford)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Toyota Lease Trust from Supreme Court, Kings County, case number 508838/2020. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13221747) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer by Toyota Lease Trust, #3 Exhibit Answer by Defendant Shtern, #4 Exhibit Response to Demand for Ad Damnum, #5 Exhibit Police Report, #6 Exhibit Consent by Defendant Shtern for Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Aaron, Clifford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atas v. Shtern et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garry Shtern
Represented By: Andres Javier Camacho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Lease Trust
Represented By: Clifford B. Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hicri Atas
Represented By: Albert K Kim
Represented By: John C. Merlino
Represented By: Steven Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?