Deboue v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Darryl Deboue
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv03736
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Courtesy copies of the Summons, the Court's 8/19/2020 Scheduling Order and Plaintiff's Complaint sent to the United States Attorney General; United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York; and General Counsel at SSA.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank D. Tankard on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (aty to be noticed) (Tankard, Frank)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER re #8 Summons Issued as to USA. Counsel is advised that on March 2, 2020, the Commissioner of Social Security filed a notice in the Federal Register setting forth the names and current addresses for service of process on the Commissioner in disability cases for each United States District Court. See https://www.federalregister.gov/documents/2020/03/02/2020-04246/notice-announcing-addresses-for-service-of-process. The Notice announced that service of process for the Eastern District of New York was directed to be made upon the Regional Chief Counsel's Office in Kansas City, Missouri. The Department of Justice and U.S. Attorneys Office shall be served in the manner prescribed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 8/21/2020. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Courtesy copies of the Summons, the Court's 8/19/2020 Scheduling Order and Plaintiff's Complaint sent to the United States Attorney General; United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York; and General Counsel at SSA.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Commissioner shall serve the administrative record upon plaintiff, or otherwise move against the complaint, within ninety (90) days of commencement of the action; plaintiff shall move for judgment on the pleadings within sixty (60) days of service of the administrative record; the Commissioner shall serve his response within sixty (60) days thereafter; within twenty-one (21) days after receipt of the Commissioner's response, plaintiff shall service a reply on defendant, and the parties shall file the entire set of motion papers, the stipulations of fact, and the administrative record with the court. The parties shall confer and prepare a stipulation of facts with a chronology of medical treatment, to be filed on ECF on the date that the fully-briefed motions are due. The court also grants #3 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 8/19/2020. (Brasky, Michael)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER re #6 Summons Issued as to USA. Summons Issued. Counsel is advised that on March 2, 2020, the Commissioner of Social Security filed a notice in the Federal Register setting forth the names and current addresses for service of process on the Commissioner in disability cases for each United States District Court. See https://www.federalregister.gov/documents/2020/03/02/2020-04246/notice-announcing-addresses-for-service-of-process. The Notice announced that service of process for the Eastern District of New York was directed to be made upon the Regional Chief Counsel's Office in Kansas City, Missouri. The Department of Justice and U.S. Attorneys Office shall be served in the manner prescribed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 8/19/2020. (Brasky, Michael)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Davis, Kimberly)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Darryl Deboue. (Klee, Jonathan)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Darryl Deboue (Klee, Jonathan)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Darryl Deboue. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appeals Council Denial, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Klee, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deboue v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Represented By: Frank D. Tankard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Deboue
Represented By: Jonathan R. Klee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?