Williams v. CVS Albany, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Karen Williams
Defendant: CVS Albany, LLC and CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03741
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon for all further proceedings. Judge Carol Bagley Amon no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Fernandez, Erica)
September 16, 2020 Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. (Fernandez, Erica)
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by CVS Albany, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Roach, Erin)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: As discussed during the 9/15/2020 conference, rebuttal expert witness reports shall be served on or before 4/2/2021. All discovery must be completed by 4/26/2021. On or before 4/26/2021, the Parties will file a joint status report letter confirming that discovery is complete. On or before 5/25/2021, the Parties will initiate any dispositive motions in accordance with the Individual Rules of the District Judge. On or before 5/31/2021, the Parties will file their joint Proposed Pretrial Order. A Telephone Conference is set for 2/11/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. On or before 2/4/2021, the Parties will file a joint status report letter, of no more than three pages, identifying any outstanding discovery disputes. he Parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283. Should the Parties experience delays or difficulty accessing the conference bridge due to a high volume of calls, please dial again. (Quinlan, Krista)
September 15, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Telephone Conference held on 9/15/2020. Matthew Schroeder appearing for Plaintiff. Frank Lorenzo appearing for Defendants. Mr. Lorenzo is to file a notice of appearance. See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding. (FTR Log #11:26-11:38.) (Quinlan, Krista)
September 15, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin D. Roach on behalf of CVS Albany, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service) (Roach, Erin)
September 15, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference is set for 9/15/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. (Quinlan, Krista)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Scheduling Order by CVS Albany, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Roach, Erin)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon for all further proceedings. Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 8/31/2020. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, a Telephonic Initial Conference is scheduled for 9/15/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with Defendant's counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 9/10/2020. The Parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283. Should the Parties experience delays or difficulty accessing the conference bridge due to a high volume of calls, please dial again. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 8/21/2020. (Quinlan, Krista)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by CVS Albany, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service) (Roach, Erin)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Karen Williams (Schroeder, Matthew)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Albert Schroeder on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Schroeder, Matthew)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by CVS Albany, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Roach, Erin)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. by CVS Albany, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Roach, Erin)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Albany, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Roach, Erin)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CVS Albany, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. from SUPREME, case number 151149/2020. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13222887) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Plaintiff's Summons and Complaint) (Roach, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. CVS Albany, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Albany, LLC
Represented By: Erin D. Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Erin D. Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Williams
Represented By: Matthew Albert Schroeder
Represented By: Lisa Lynn Grieco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?