The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO et al v. Glassmar Steel Erectors, Inc.
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO, International Union of Operating Engineers National Training Fund, Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers and The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO
Defendant: Glassmar Steel Erectors, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03743
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Pamela K Chen
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING MOTION: Plaintiffs' #8 motion for a default judgment is respectfully referred to the Honorable Lois Bloom for a report and recommendation. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 10/15/2020. (Wisotsky, Shira)
October 14, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO, International Union of Operating Engineers National Training Fund, The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO re #6 Request for Certificate of Default,, #7 Clerk's Entry of Default, #13 Memorandum in Support,, #8 Notice of MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Glassmar Steel Erectors, Inc., #9 Affidavit in Support of Motion,, #11 Affidavit in Support of Motion,, #10 Affidavit in Support of Motion,, #12 Affidavit in Support of Motion,,, served upon Defendant via express mail delivery on October 14, 2020. (Steinberg, James)
October 14, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 Notice of MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Glassmar Steel Erectors, Inc. filed by Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO, International Union of Operating Engineers National Training Fund, The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO. (Steinberg, James)
October 14, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #8 Notice of MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Glassmar Steel Erectors, Inc. (Affidavit of James M. Steinberg, Esq.) filed by Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO, International Union of Operating Engineers National Training Fund, The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C1, #4 Exhibit C2, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M) (Steinberg, James)
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #8 Notice of MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Glassmar Steel Erectors, Inc. (Affidavit of C. Chase) filed by Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO, International Union of Operating Engineers National Training Fund, The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO. (Steinberg, James)
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #8 Notice of MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Glassmar Steel Erectors, Inc. (Affidavit of L. Madeiras) filed by Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO, International Union of Operating Engineers National Training Fund, The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO. (Steinberg, James)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #8 Notice of MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Glassmar Steel Erectors, Inc. (Affidavit of T. Callahan) filed by Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO, International Union of Operating Engineers National Training Fund, The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO. (Steinberg, James)
October 14, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Glassmar Steel Erectors, Inc. by Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO, International Union of Operating Engineers National Training Fund, The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Damages) (Steinberg, James)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Glassmar Steel Erectors, Inc. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Glassmar Steel Erectors, Inc. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Certificate of Default by Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO, International Union of Operating Engineers National Training Fund, The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO (Attachments: #1 Affirmation in Support of Request for Certificate of Default, #2 Proposed Certificate of Default) (Steinberg, James)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO, International Union of Operating Engineers National Training Fund, Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers. Glassmar Steel Erectors, Inc. served on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (Steinberg, James)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Glassmar Steel Erectors, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Glassmar Steel Erectors, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13222538 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO, International Union of Operating Engineers National Training Fund, Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Steinberg, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO et al v. Glassmar Steel Erectors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glassmar Steel Erectors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO
Represented By: James Michael Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers National Training Fund
Represented By: James Michael Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers
Represented By: James Michael Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO
Represented By: James Michael Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?