Ransom v. Gorman et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Ransom
Defendant: Sgt. Mathwew Gorman, Officer Giuseppe Divanna, Sgt. Hoorallah Mashrie, Officer Daniel Oliver and Officer Jessica Torrez
Case Number: 1:2020cv03755
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Eric R Komitee
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: On October 14, 2020, the Court granted Plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis and directed the United States Marshals Service to serve of the summons and complaint on Sgt. Mathwew Gorman, Sgt. Hoorallah Mashrie, Officer Jessica Torrez, Officer Daniel Oliver and Officer Giuseppe Divanna at One Police Plaza, New York, New York 10038 listed in the complaint 20-CV-3755 (EK)(SJB). Accordingly, pursuant to Valentin v. Dinkins, 121 F.3d 72 (2d Cir. 1997) (per curiam), the Court requests that the Office of the Corporation Counsel to provide the full name and correct service address for Sgt. Mathwew Gorman, Sgt. Hoorallah Mashrie, Officer Jessica Torrez, Officer Daniel Oliver and Officer Giuseppe Divanna or agree to accept service on their behalf by November 30, 2020. The Office of the Corporation Counsel need not undertake to defend this individual at this juncture. This Order merely provides a means by which plaintiff may properly serve these defendants. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 10/15/2020. (Manson, Eddie)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: On October 8, 2020, plaintiff Christopher Ransom, filed this action against New York City Police Department officers pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983. Plaintiffs application to proceed in forma pauperis #2 under 28 U.S.C. 1915 is hereby granted. The United States Marshals Service is directed to serve the summons and complaint upon the defendants without prepayment of fees as soon as practicable after the Chief Judge of the Eastern District lifts the suspension of service by the United States Marshals Service. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this Order to the Plaintiff and to the Special Federal Litigation Division of the Corporation Counsel for the City of New York. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 10/14/2020. (Manson, Eddie)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to Pay Civil Filing Fee - Prisoner Case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (as amended July 26, 1996), plaintiff/petitioner is proceeding in forma pauperis and must pay the total $350 fee by monthly installments deducted from plaintiffs/petitioners prison trust fund account (or institutional equivalent). Original letter sent to the Warden/Superintendent of Correctional Facility. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Authorization) (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Ransom. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Christopher Ransom. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/15/2020) (Lee, Tiffeny). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/15/2020) (Lee, Tiffeny).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ransom v. Gorman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Mathwew Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Giuseppe Divanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Hoorallah Mashrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Daniel Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jessica Torrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Ransom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?