Quicksilver Capital v. Reliable Electric LLC et al
Plaintiff: Quicksilver Capital
Defendant: Richard Appleton and Reliable Electric LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv03756
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Incomplete ACO Case Termination/Statistical/Non Reportable Closing. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 28, 2020 ***FINAL NOTICE:*** : The Clerks Office is awaiting the Correct Filing of the Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Proposed Summon and the Civil Filing Fee payment for the following case so that it may be processed. If in 30 days of the filing date (8/17/2020), we do not receive the correct and completed filing, this case will be administratively closed. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 19, 2020 Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information. Please file the Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Proposed Summon and pay the Civil Filing for the following case so that we may process this case. Please use the CORRECT event -Complaint, Under Initial Pleadings and Service. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 First MOTION for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Complaint by Quicksilver Capital. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Warren, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quicksilver Capital v. Reliable Electric LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Appleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliable Electric LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quicksilver Capital
Represented By: Christopher D. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?