Olivan v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Eric Olivan
Defendant: UC 331, John Does 1-5, City of New York and Michael Kobus
Case Number: 1:2020cv03760
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer -- The motion is granted on consent as to the City of New York only. The City of New York must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by November 9, 2020. In light of the delay occasioned by the latter ruling, I impose certain additional obligations on both parties that will avoid delaying the proceedings even further: (a) no later than September 16, 2020, the City's counsel must provide to the plaintiff for execution a release pursuant to N.Y.C.P.L. Sec. 160.50 with respect to the arrest at issue in the litigation, as well as a release authorizing the disclosure of relevant medical records if the plaintiff is seeking damages for any physical or mental injury; (b) no later than September 23, 2020, the plaintiff must execute any such release; and (c) no later than November 11, 2020, the City's counsel must provide to the plaintiff the names, shield numbers, and proper service addresses of all individual officers involved in, or present at the scene of, the arrest at issue in this litigation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/9/2020. (Oliner, Daniel)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by City of New York. (Marquez, Jorge)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Olivan. City of New York served on 8/18/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Joubin, Cyrus)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of New York. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of New York, John Does 1-5(individually), John Does 1-5(in their official capacities), Michael Kobus(individually), Michael Kobus(in his official capacity), UC 331(in his official capacity), UC 331(individually) filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13225376 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Eric Olivan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Joubin, Cyrus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olivan v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UC 331
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Jorge Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kobus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Olivan
Represented By: Cyrus Joubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?